judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SABINA MIGUEL ORPEZA V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0282
Short Caption:SABINA MIGUEL ORPEZA V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Lead:11-CM-0282Consolidated: 11-CM-0378
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD22202-10Filed Date:03/01/2011

Opening Event Date:03/01/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/14/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/25/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSabina Miguel Orpeza Y
Joel Robert DavidsonYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Erik KenersonNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/01/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/22/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Joel Davidson, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
03/22/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Joel Davidson, Esquire
04/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (74pgs/Tape) 2/25/11 proc. w/ CD
04/14/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/19/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/21/2011RECORD INDEX
04/21/2011RECORD COPIES
04/22/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
05/24/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF NO OPPO 90 DAYS
06/09/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before August 29, 2011. (By: JAC)
06/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (64pgs/Tape) 2/25/11 proc. w/CD (missing portion)
08/26/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
08/26/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
09/13/2011FiledMotion To Consolidate - w/Carlos Paz appeal case and extension of time to file consolidated response (Appellee)Granted
10/21/2011FiledOrder Granting appellee's Motion To Consolidate, directing appellant's brief and limited appendix in appeal no. 11-CM-378 and granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief within 30 days from the date the brief of appellant and limited appendix is filed in appeal no. 11-cm-378
11/29/2011FiledBrief (11-CM-378) (Appellant)
11/29/2011FiledAppendix (11-CM-378) (Appellant)
01/03/2012FiledMotion To Remand - to vacate convictions (Appellee)deGranted
01/10/2012FiledNotice Received - consenting to the motion to remand to vacate the convictions filed by the aple (Paz) (Appellant)
01/25/2012FiledOrder Granting appellee's motion to remand to vacate convictions
01/25/2012FiledRemanded
01/25/2012FiledMandate