judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CANNON (MICHAEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33584
Short Caption:CANNON (MICHAEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34355
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C150676Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/11/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/11/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Sat in district court proceedings.
01/11/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-00135
02/05/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: " . . . we order this appeal dismissed without prejudice to appellant's right to file and perfect a timely appeal following the district court's pronouncement of the sentence." NNP99A-RR/CY/MS 99-00820
03/02/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-01441
03/02/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/12/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 9, 1999. 99-01441