judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DENARDO D. HOPKINS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0655
Short Caption:DENARDO D. HOPKINS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Lead: 10-CF-0583 Consolidated:10-CF-0655
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-4572-08Filed Date:06/01/2010

Opening Event Date:06/01/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/04/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:09/26/2012
Argued/Submitted:02/05/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/08/2014
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDenardo Sequan HopkinsY
Christopher R. PudelskiYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/01/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
06/23/2010ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 10-CF-583 and 10-CF-655 are consolidated for all purposes. F/O that Christopher Pudelski, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent Denardo D. Hopkins in appeal no. 10-CF-655. F/O that counsel for appellant Denardo D. hopkins shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file withthis court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Divsion to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
06/23/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Christopher Pudelski, Esquire
07/20/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (HOPKINS) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
03/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (16 pgs/tape) 2/29/08 proc.
03/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (67 pgs/Janifer) 3/21/08 proc.
03/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (8 pgs/Wood) 4/30/10 proc.
03/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (32 pgs/Richer) 5/5/10 proc.
03/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (10 pgs/Hunt) 1/11/10 proc.
03/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (101 pgs/Mccarn) 1/12/10 proc.
03/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (202 pgs/Hunt) 1/12-14/10 proc.
03/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (53 pgs/Van Bremen) 1/21/10 proc.
03/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (106 pgs/Jeon) 1/22/10 proc.
03/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (491 pgs/Allsion) 1/25-27/10 proc.
03/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #11 (174 pgs/Hunt) 2/16/10 proc.
03/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #12 (336 pgs/McCarn) 2/17-19,22,23&26 proc.
03/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #13 (24 pgs/Ott) 3/9/10 proc.
03/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #14 (43 pgs/Ott) 3/10/10 proc.
03/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #15 (35 pgs/Ott) 3/11/10 proc.
03/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #16 (17 pgs/Ott) 5/26/10 proc. w/cd
04/04/2011RECORD INDEX (10-CF-655)
04/04/2011RECORD COPIES (10-CF-655)
04/04/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #17 (Judge Dixon orders--- SEALED)
04/04/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/05/2011FiledRecord Copies (10-CF-583)
04/05/2011FiledRecord Index (10-CF-583)
05/12/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellants' briefs and the limited appendixes including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
05/19/2011FiledAPPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until completion of transcripts (no oppo) (Harrison)
05/25/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until completion of transcripts for 1/28-29/10, 2/1-2/10 (no oppo) (Hopkins) (Titled: Aplt's motion to vacate briefing order)
08/02/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #18 (492-888 pgs/Allsion) 1/28-29/10 proc.
08/02/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #19 (889-1351 pgs/Allsion) 2/1-2/10 proc. w/cd
08/02/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #20 (8 pgs/Wood) 4/30/10 proc.
08/02/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #21 (12 pgs/Richer) 5/5/10 proc.
08/25/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellants Steven T. Harrison and Denardo D. Hopkins' motions for extensions of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix.
09/23/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) (Hopkins)
10/03/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) (Harrison)
10/12/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant Hopkins' and Harrison's motions for extensions of time within which to file their briefs.
11/28/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File (Hopkins) Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
12/22/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant Hopkins' motion for extension to file the brief and limited appendix to 3/5/12.
01/31/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Harrison) (Appellant)
03/05/2012FiledBrief (Hopkins) (Appellant)
03/05/2012FiledAppendix with brief. (Appellant)
03/21/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Harrison) (Appellant) to 4/30/12.
04/23/2012FiledBrief (Harrison) (Appellant)
04/23/2012FiledAppendix with brief(Appellant)
05/24/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
05/30/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 7/27/12.
07/24/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
08/02/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 9/10/12
09/10/2012FiledMotion For Leave To File Excess-Paged Brief (Appellee)Granted
09/17/2012FiledTMC//MOTION TO FILE LODGED EXCESS PAGE BRIEF
09/26/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave and the CLERK SHALL FILE APPELLEE'S LODGED BRIEF
09/26/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
09/26/2012FiledBriefing Completed
10/01/2012FiledReply Brief (Harrison) (Appellant)
10/16/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
10/16/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
12/21/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/05/2013FiledArgued Before Judges Fisher,Blackburne-Rigsy,Ferren, Donald L. Dworsky Esq.,for appellant Steven T.Harrison. Christopher R.Pudelski Esq.,for appellant Denardo D. Hopkins. Leslie Ann Gerardo Esq.,for appellee.
08/29/2013FiledAffirmed In Part/Remanded In Part (OPINION) (Fisher and Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges; and Ferren, Senior Judge)
09/12/2013FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Hopkins) (Appellant)
12/16/2013FiledOrder Denying the petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc
01/08/2014FiledMandate (BOTH)
03/11/2014FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)