judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DONNELL JONES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0654
Short Caption:DONNELL JONES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-915-09Filed Date:05/28/2010

Opening Event Date:05/28/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/29/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/22/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDonnell Jones YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Kevin A. Chambers NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/28/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
06/18/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that David H. Reiter, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
06/18/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) David H. Reiter, Esquire
07/09/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
07/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (185 pgs/Ronan) 3/15&18/10 proc.
07/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (5 pgs/Graybill) 3/19/10 proc. a.m.
07/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (5 pgs/tape) 3/19/10 proc. (supp to Graybill SR#2) CD attached
07/29/2010RECORD COMPLETED
08/05/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
08/09/2010RECORD INDEX
08/09/2010RECORD COPIES
09/03/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 30 days. no oppo
09/07/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before October 14, 2010. For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk.
10/12/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
10/12/2010APPENDIX
11/16/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
11/17/2010TMC - motion for summary affirmance - appellant's brief - RT 3/15,18,19/10
02/28/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED. Oliver T. Carr Mgm't Inc. v. Nat'l Deli Inc. 397 A.2d 914, 915 (DC 1979)... SEE HARDCOPY It is ****MORE****
02/28/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal is hereby AFFIRMED. (GLTHTE) (jl)
03/07/2011CJA ATTORNEY'S QUALLS LETTER
03/22/2011MANDATE ISSUED