judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MATTHEWS, JR. (FELTON) VS. STATE C/W 38307/38380

Case Information: 38379
Short Caption:MATTHEWS, JR. (FELTON) VS. STATE C/W 38307/38380Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 38307 *, 38379, 38380 Related Case(s): 38225 , 38307 , 38380 , 39014 , 39717 , 39837 , 39885 , 40033 , 40299 , 40468 , 40568 , 40605 , 40709 , 40902 , 41149 , 41204 , 41483 , 41557 , 43380 , 43405 , 43742 , 43822 , 44343 , 46338 , 46475 , 46551 , 46868 , 47145 , 47339 , 49757 , 50871 , 53552 , 56441 , 59017 , 59247 , 61018 , 67854 , 67854-COA , 70855 , 70855-COA , 80068
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C174537Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/23/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/23/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-14352
10/01/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. 'ORDER these appeals DISMISSED.' fn2[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in these matters, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP02-CY/DA/ML. Nos. 38307/38379/38380. 01-16465
10/30/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-16575
10/30/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/09/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 2, 2001. 01-16575