judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KATHERINE CALOMIRIS TOMPROS, ET AL V. MARY CALOMIRIS

Case Information: 11-PR-0250
Short Caption:KATHERINE CALOMIRIS TOMPROS, ET AL V. MARY CALOMIRISClassification:Appeals - Probate - Probate
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LIT24-09Filed Date:02/22/2011

Opening Event Date:02/22/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/27/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKatherine Calomiris Tompros N
Anthony J. Pagano NN
AppellantJenifer Calomiris N
Steven P. HollmanNY
AppellantCharles Calomiris N
Steven P. HollmanNY
AppelleeMary Calomiris N
Stephen J. O'ConnorNY
Michael F. CurtinNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/22/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/10/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANTS shall w/n 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be limited solely to the part of the order that denied the motion for stay... (BY: ETW)
03/29/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL no oppo
04/05/2011 ORDERED that THIS APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED with appellants bearing all costs and fees associated with this appeal. See DC App. R. 13 (a). (BY: ETW) LW
04/05/2011DISMISSED
04/27/2011MANDATE ISSUED