judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HENSLEY (MICHAEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38378
Short Caption:HENSLEY (MICHAEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 50376
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C103365Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/23/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/23/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14350
09/14/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-15566
09/18/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed September 14, 2001. Appellant shall have until September 21, 2001, to file and serve the docketing statement. 01-15736
09/24/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-16045
10/10/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date appellant has failed to file either a transcript request form or a certificate indicating that no transcripts are being requested. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the required document. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions. 01-17067
10/24/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 01-17878
12/21/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: January 21, 2002. 01-21562
01/23/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-01502
01/23/2002Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed January 23, 2002. Appellant shall have 5 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. 02-01606
01/28/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 01/25/02. 02-01805
01/28/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume I. 02-01806
03/04/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. Signed by James Tufteland. 02-03894
03/28/2002MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: April 10, 2002. 02-05540
04/12/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 04/11/02. Signed by: Christopher R. Oram. 02-06551
05/30/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn9[Pursuant to NRAP 34(f)(1), we have determined that oral argument is not warranted in this appeal.] NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-09421
06/25/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-09493
06/25/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/03/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 27, 2002. 02-09493