judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

1900 M RESTAURANT ASSOC. INC. V. DC ALCOHOL BEV. CONT. BD.

Case Information: 11-AA-0245
Short Caption:1900 M RESTAURANT ASSOC. INC. V. DC ALCOHOL BEV. CONT. BD.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Alcohol Beverage Control Board (ABC)
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:09-251-00110Filed Date:03/02/2011

Opening Event Date:03/02/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/11/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/28/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/06/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/25/2013

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Petitioner1900 M Restaurant Associates IncorporatedN
Scott H. RomeNY
Mark S. LondonNY
Christopher B. MeadYY
RespondentD.C. Alcoholic Beverage Control BoardN
Todd S. KimNY
Richard S. LoveYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/25/2000 It appearing that the brief of petitioner, was filed with this court on May 24, 2011, and it further appearing that the appendix was due to be filed on or before May 24, 2011, and has not been filed, (See D.C. App. R. 30, 31.), it is ORDERED that petitioner shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the appendix or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of respondent shall be filed within 30 days from the date the appendix is filed with this court. (dlm)
03/02/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
03/02/2011FILING FEE of $100.00.
03/02/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD and Todd Kim, Esq.
04/11/2011RECORD ON APPEAL w/ hearing 6/9/10,11/18/10 & 4/1/09 3 black binders
04/11/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/14/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
05/24/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF
05/24/2011APPENDIX
06/28/2011RESPONDENT'S BRIEF
06/28/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
07/13/2011FiledReply Brief (Petitioner)
08/10/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/02/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
12/20/2011FiledAppearance by Christopher Mead (Petitioner)
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/06/2012FiledArgued Before Washington,Glickman,Reid Chirstopher B.Mead Esq,.for appellant. Richard S,Love Esq.,for appellee
11/29/2012FiledReversed (OPINION) (Washington, Chief Judge, Glickman, Associate Judge, and Reid, Senior Judge.)
12/14/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File to file it petition for rehearing Other (Respondent)Granted
12/26/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file a petition for rehearing to 1/18/13.
01/25/2013FiledOrdered that the Clerk shall issue the mandate forthwith.
01/25/2013FiledMandate