judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

OPERATION SAVE AMERICA v. THE CITY OF JACKSON, a Wyoming municipal corporation

Case Heading (S-11-0149)
Case Number:S-11-0149Case Docketed On:06/17/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Cities and Towns (Title 15)
Short Title:OPERATION SAVE AMERICA v. THE CITY OF JACKSON, a Wyoming municipal corporation
Full Title:OPERATION SAVE AMERICA, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE CITY OF JACKSON, a Wyoming municipal corporation, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantOperation Save AmericaJack Daniel Edwards
AppelleeCity of JacksonAudrey Paula Cohen-Davis

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Constitutional Law - Federal
Opinion Number:2012 WY 51
Citation:275 P.3d 438

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/17/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/17/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/17/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/17/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/04/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/08/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/09/2011Notice-Incoming - Designation of record, entire record designated.Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
09/19/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/21/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/29/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/05/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Audrey Cohen-Davis for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/05/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jack D. Edwards for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/07/2011Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
10/07/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/07/2011Motion - Supplement the recordMotionSupplement the recordFinal
10/10/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/11/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's statement of additional authorities.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/11/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's motion to supplement the record; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/11/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's reply briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/13/2011Motion - StrikeMotionStrikeFinal
10/17/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Motion to Strike Appellant's Statement of Additional Authorities and Appellant's Motion to Supplement the RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/21/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
10/21/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Designation Attachments.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/21/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/01/2011Order - Granting Motion to Supplement Record and Order Granting Motion to Strike Appellant's Statement of Additional AuthoritiesOrderGrantFinal
11/08/2011Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
11/10/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Letter of Additional AuthorityEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/10/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Jack Daniel Edwards for appellant; Audrey Paula Cohen-Davis for appellee) and taken under advisemen.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/10/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/10/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing. Justice Golden writing for the court. Chief Justice Kite files a dissenting opinion in which Justice Hill joins.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/26/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/26/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/26/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/03/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for on 5/1/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal