judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SMITH (DONALD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38374
Short Caption:SMITH (DONALD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 40058
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C171797Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/23/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/23/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 01-14341
10/31/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, no fast track statement has been filed. Appellant's counsel Gary E. Gowen shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 01-18212
12/03/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-20242
12/07/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed December 3, 2001. Counsel shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. 01-20604
12/19/2001MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File an Eleven Page Fast Track Statement. 01-21431
12/19/2001Fast Track BriefReceived Fast Track Statement. 01-21432
12/19/2001AppendixReceived Appendix. Appellant's Fast Track Appendix. 01-21436
12/21/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed December 19, 2001. The clerk shall file the 11-page fast track statement and appendix received on December 19, 2001. Respondent shall file and serve the fast track response within 20 days from the date of this order. 01-21523
12/21/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-21432
12/21/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-21436
12/31/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: August 6, 2001. Court Reporter: Debra Van Blaricom. Filed in district court on: December 26, 2001. 01-21880
01/09/2002TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: August 6, 2001. Court Reporter: Debra Van Blaricom. 02-00617
01/14/2002Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 02-00885
01/14/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 02-00886
03/05/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Affirming in Part, Vacating in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART and VACATEC IN PART and REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-03949
04/02/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-04053
04/02/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/15/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 4, 2002. 02-04053