judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

VOSS (STEVEN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38373
Short Caption:VOSS (STEVEN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 74227 , 74227-COA , 78050 , 78050-COA , 80062 , 80062-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR96P1581Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:AgostiCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Maupin for Justice AgostiPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/23/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/23/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-14340
08/24/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 8, 2001. Court Reporter: Debbie Vieira. 01-14377
08/28/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Agosti. Sat in district court proceedings.
09/28/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: October 9, 2001. 01-16350
10/09/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-16902
10/09/2001AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 01-16903
10/23/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-17855
01/17/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered Voss' contentions and concluded that they lack merit, we "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-WM/CY/ML 02-01243
02/12/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-01552
02/12/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/21/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 14, 2002. 02-01552