judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

AUSTIN KINCAID V. WAREHOUSE CAFE

Case Information: 11-AA-0242
Short Caption:AUSTIN KINCAID V. WAREHOUSE CAFEClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES03153-10Filed Date:03/02/2011

Opening Event Date:03/02/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/27/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/29/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/22/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/07/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerAustin Kincaid NPro SeN
RespondentWarehouse CafeNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/02/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
03/02/2011FILING FEE OF $100.00.
03/02/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH AND MICHAEL A. MILWEE, ESQ.
03/18/2011 On consideration of the petition for review in this matter, and it appearing that Warehouse Cafe is a business that must be represented by counsel, it is ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 9D.C. 2001); D.C. APP. R. 15 (A)(5). It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
04/22/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 18, 2011, directing respondent to identify its counsel within 30 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that respondent has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that respondent shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall result in respondent being prohibited from filing its brief. (JAC)
06/03/2011RECEIVED - Resp ltr to petitioner re payment for audio recording on CD.
06/27/2011RECORD ON APPEAL
06/27/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/30/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
08/18/2011FiledOrder - directing motion, brief & appendix
09/07/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File Brief and Appendix (Petitioner)Granted
09/08/2011FiledReceived - 8/18/11 order returned rom post office that was sent to Warehouse Cafe . Sent to file room.
09/28/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File Brief and Appendix & directing respondent to dientify counsel
09/28/2011FiledBrief (Petitioner)
09/28/2011FiledAppendix (Petitioner)
10/07/2011FiledReceived orders sent to petitioner and respondet returned from post office. Order sent to respondent was mailed to wrong address. Petitioner was called and his new address was updated on C track. Both orders remailed and date reset for respondent (Petitioner Kincaid, Respondent Warehouse Cafe)
11/29/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte - scheduled for consideration before a merits division on record and petitioenr's brief alone
11/29/2011FiledBriefing Completed
01/12/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/22/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, Beckwith, Ferren
03/30/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and Ferren, Senior Judge.)
05/07/2012FiledMandate