judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DRAKE VS. BOARD OF COMM'RS

Case Information: 38394
Short Caption:DRAKE VS. BOARD OF COMM'RSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0101973Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/12/2001How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/28/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/28/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-14568
09/05/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn3[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 01-14999
09/12/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. 01-15414
09/12/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/11/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn7[In light of this order, we deny appellant's September 5, 2001 motion for leave to file a proper person opening brief and reply, or in the alternative for the appointment of counsel.] NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-02645
03/08/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal this day. 02-02770
03/08/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 12, 2002. 02-02770