judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FEVEN WALDU V. DOMINIC ARCHIBOLD

Case Information: 11-CV-0264
Short Caption:FEVEN WALDU V. DOMINIC ARCHIBOLDClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LTB33190-10Filed Date:02/23/2011

Opening Event Date:02/23/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/02/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantFeven Waldu YPro SeN
AppelleeCol Dominic Archilbold NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/23/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/11/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on February 23, 2011, and it appearing that appellant was granted in forma pauperis status in the trial court, and it further appearing that transcript may be needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file with the Court Reporting Division a motion for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s), for determination in accordance with Hancock v. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10(b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit the motion to the appropriate judge for a decision as to whether transcripts will be provided at no cost. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of that motion with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
03/15/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL (filed by appellee pro se)
05/05/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 11, 2011, directing appellant to submit to this court a file-stamped copy of the motion for appeal transcript filed in the Superior Court, within 10 calendar days from the date of the order, but it appearing that this court's order was returned as undeliverable, and re0mailed to appellant at the most current address on filed, and it further appearing that appellant has failed to comply with this order, and appellee's motion to dismiss appeal, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellee's motion to dismiss appeal is granted and this appeal is hereby dismissed. (ETW) elp
05/05/2011DISMISSED
06/02/2011MANDATE ISSUED