judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LEONARD HEYMOND WISE V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 11-CT-0263
Short Caption:LEONARD HEYMOND WISE V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Criminal - DC - Traffic
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CTF6146-10Filed Date:02/28/2011

Opening Event Date:02/28/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/18/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLeonard Heymond Wise Y
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Rosalyn Calbert GroceNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/28/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/17/2011 ORDERED that appellant shall W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed EITHER as UNTIMELY OR for LACK OF JURISDICTION since an associate judge's review of a magistrate judge's decision is a prerequisite for appeal... (BY: ETW)
03/17/2011TMC - OTSC
04/21/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (62pgs/Tape) 6/22/10 proc. w/CD
04/26/2011 ORDERED that this APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. D.C. Code 11-1732 (k)(2001). (THKNTE)
04/26/2011DISMISSED
04/27/2011RECEIVED - Record index
04/27/2011RECEIVED - Record copies
05/18/2011MANDATE ISSUED