judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBERT JULIAN McCLURE, JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0243)
Case Number:S-09-0243Case Docketed On:11/23/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Lincoln CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:ROBERT JULIAN McCLURE, JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ROBERT JULIAN McCLURE, JR., Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRobert Julian McClure Jr.Diane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Craig C. Cook

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Constitutional Law, Criminal Law, Trial - Post-trial Motions
Opinion Number:2010 WY 112
Citation:236 P.3d 1019

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/23/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/23/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/23/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/11/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/11/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; received copy of designation of record on appeal; and received copy of order attached to brief without redactions.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/23/2010Notice-Incoming - Consent and ApprovalNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
02/23/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/24/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Consent and ApprovalEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/24/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/12/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
03/16/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/17/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - David Westling for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/01/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts (labeled as volumes III-VI) and Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/01/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/09/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Craig C. Cook, Student Intern, for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/13/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (David Westling, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; D. Michael Pauling, Senior Assistant Attorney General and Craig C. Cook, Student Intern, argument by Mr. Cook for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/13/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/05/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/23/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/23/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/27/2010Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal