judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE, DEP'T TRANSP. VS. PUB. EMPLOYEES' RET. SYS.

Case Information: 38388
Short Caption:STATE, DEP'T TRANSP. VS. PUB. EMPLOYEES' RET. SYS.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 0000243AClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:09/10/2001 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:06/23/2003 at 9:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:06/23/2003How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/28/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/28/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14518
09/07/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-15104
09/10/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/11/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Carolyn Worrell.
12/14/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: March 22, 2002. 01-21125
04/15/2002MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Motion for Stay of District Court's Decision. 02-06697
05/03/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant has moved to stay the district court's order. We grant the motion and stay the district court's order entered in Case No. 00-00243A on July 23, 2001, pending resolution of this appeal. 02-07827
05/22/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 02-08972
05/29/2002Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the time deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 02-09340
06/10/2002Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: April 11, 2000. To Court Reporter: April 11, 2000. 02-10138
06/21/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: April 11, 2000. Court Reporter: Julietta Forbes. 02-10817
09/20/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 09/19/02. 02-16370
09/20/2002AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 and 2. 02-16371
10/22/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: November 20, 2002. 02-18327
11/21/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 11/20/02. 02-20100
11/21/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Joint Appendix Supplement. 02-20101
12/23/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Reply Brief. 02-21940
12/23/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 12/19/02. 02-21945
05/02/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on June 23, 2003, at 9:00 a.m. (En Banc)
06/09/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
06/23/2003Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the En Banc Court.
01/30/2004Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." fn1[This matter was submitted for decision by the seven-justice court. The Honorable Myron E. Leavitt, Justice, having died in office on January 9, 2004, this matter was decided by a six-justice court.] Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Shearing, C.J. We concur: Agosti, Rose, Becker, Maupin and Gibbons, JJ. 120 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 4. EN BANC. 04-01937
02/24/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-02028
02/24/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/03/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 25, 2004. 04-02028