judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THOMAS LEROY SANDERS v. SHIRLEY K. SANDERS and DANIEL K. SANDERS

Case Heading (S-09-0238)
Case Number:S-09-0238Case Docketed On:11/12/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Goshen CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:THOMAS LEROY SANDERS v. SHIRLEY K. SANDERS and DANIEL K. SANDERS
Full Title:THOMAS LEROY SANDERS, Appellant (Defendant), v. SHIRLEY K. SANDERS and DANIEL K. SANDERS, Appellees (Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantThomas LeRoy SandersDon W. Riske
James R. Salisbury
AppelleeShirley K. SandersJohn J. Maier
AppelleeDaniel K. SandersJohn J. Maier

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Property - Real
Opinion Number:2010 WY 77
Citation:234 P.3d 343 (Wyo. 2010)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/12/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/12/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/12/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/12/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/09/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/09/2009Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
12/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant, Appellant's Statement of Costs and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/26/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/27/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/11/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/17/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - John Maier for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - James Salisbury for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/23/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/23/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcript and Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/23/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/18/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (James R. Salisbury for appellant; John J. Maier for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/18/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/15/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversingOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
06/15/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's bill of costs; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/07/2010Order - Other - Order awarding costs on reversalOrderOtherFinal
07/07/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/07/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/07/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/07/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/12/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/9/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal