Case Information: 38389 | |||
Short Caption: | DAYSIDE, INC. VS. PFI CONCRETE, INC. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A436156 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 09/05/2001 / Mendoza, John | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/28/2001 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from McCullough & Associates--check no. 1426. | ||
08/28/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 01-14524 | |
09/05/2001 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: John F. Mendoza. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
09/12/2001 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 01-15408 | |
09/14/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. John F. Mendoza. | ||
11/13/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 01-18855 | |
11/13/2001 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. | 01-18856 | |
11/21/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b) SNP/CLK | 01-19549 | |
11/21/2001 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |