judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SULLIVAN CONSTRUCTION, LLC v. PINE GLADES DEVELOPMENT, LLC

Case Heading (S-09-0239)
Case Number:S-09-0239Case Docketed On:11/12/2009
Linked To: S-09-0240
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Liens (Title 29)
Short Title:SULLIVAN CONSTRUCTION, LLC v. PINE GLADES DEVELOPMENT, LLC
Full Title:SULLIVAN CONSTRUCTION, LLC, Appellant (Respondent), v. PINE GLADES DEVELOPMENT, LLC, Appellee (Petitioner).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSullivan Construction, LLCMark Diehl Sullivan
AppelleePine Glades Development, LLCGlenn Martin Ford
Glenn W. Myers
Molly Hartman Dearing

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/12/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/12/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
11/12/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/12/2009Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
11/12/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/19/2009Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
12/28/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/04/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Brief in Support of AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
01/20/2010Order - Stay briefing Pending Ruling by Bankruptcy CourtOrderStay briefingFinal
02/19/2010System - Status check - bankruptcy. Contacted counsel for appellant. He indicated a hearing is set for March 10, 2010, and the motion to lift stay will be part of that hearing. He will keep the court informed.SystemStatus check - bankruptcyFinal
03/18/2010Motion - Dismiss - stipulatedMotionDismiss - stipulatedFinal
03/23/2010Event - Hardcopy received Motion to Dismiss Appeals and Joint Stipulation for Dismissal with PrejudiceEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/23/2010Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
03/23/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal