judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

NICOLE DIXON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0259
Short Caption:NICOLE DIXON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Lead:11-CM-0259Consolidated: 12-CO-0578
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM2695-10Filed Date:02/25/2011

Opening Event Date:02/25/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/20/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/10/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantNicole Dixon Y
Thomas PaynterNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/25/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/16/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Sydney Hoffmann, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
03/16/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Sydney Hoffmann, Esquire
04/01/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
04/19/2011ORDERED: Sua sponte, that the appointment of Sydney Jean Hoffmann, Esquire, is hereby vacated, adn Tom Paynter, Esquire, is appointed to represent appellant herein. Sydney Jean Hoffmann, Esquire, shall transmit all documents pertaining to this appeal to newly-appointed counsel forthwith. (By: ETW)
04/20/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (56pgs/Tape) 2/17/11 proc. w/CD
04/20/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/21/2011RECORD INDEX
04/21/2011RECORD COPIES
04/25/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
06/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (10 pgs/tape) 2/17/11 proc. w/cd
06/06/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY
06/09/2011APPEARANCE of Thomas C. Paynter as counsel for Appellant (Counsel was already on this case for Appellant).
06/24/2011ORDERED: That the motion is hereby held in abeyance for 90 days to permit the trial court to rule on the pending motion. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall advise this court on or before October 3, 2011, as to the status of the motion in the trial court. (By: ETW)
08/11/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #3 (19pgs/Tape) 12/16/10 proc. w/CD
10/11/2011FiledNotice Received of the Progress of the Sec. 23-110 Motion in Superior Court. (Appellant) (still pending)dfe
11/18/2011FiledOrdered that appellant shall file a renewed statement on the status of the motion in the trial court on or before January 6, 2012. Appellant's motion to stay appeal remains held in abeyance
01/30/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's mtoion to stay and directing briefing
01/30/2012FiledBriefing Order
03/09/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief for 30 days. Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
03/30/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief on or before April 11, 2012
04/09/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief for 40 days after the completion of the transcripts (Appellant)Granted
04/30/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellat's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix (for RT reasons) for 40 days from the date the transcript is filed with this court
05/10/2012FiledStatement regarding transcript (Appellant)
05/23/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte Consolidating Appeals nos. 11-cm-259 and 12-co-578 for all purposes herein, appointing counsel and directing the srt in 12-co-578 tobe filed within 30 days from the date of this order
05/23/2012FiledInitial Order
05/23/2012FiledAppointing Counsel/CJA Thomas Paynter, Esquire for appeal no. 12-co-578 (Appellant)
06/11/2012FiledSupplemental Record - #4 (44pgs/Tape) 2/17/12 proc. w/CD
06/12/2012FiledRecord Copies (12-CO-578)
06/12/2012FiledRecord Index (12-CO-578)
06/25/2012FiledBriefing Order
08/06/2012FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw Under Anders (Appellant)Granted
08/15/2012FiledORDER THAT APPELLANT SHALL NO LATER THAN 9/5/12 FILE A RESPONSE TO COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW
08/15/2012FiledTMC//MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS)
12/19/2012FiledORDER GRANTING COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS)
12/19/2012FiledAffirmed
01/10/2013FiledMandate