judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JENNIFER BEATTIE and JOE BENTLEY CONGER v. DANIEL MAYNARD

Case Heading (S-09-0236)
Case Number:S-09-0236Case Docketed On:11/06/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Lincoln CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:JENNIFER BEATTIE and JOE BENTLEY CONGER v. DANIEL MAYNARD
Full Title:JENNIFER BEATTIE and JOE BENTLEY CONGER, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. DANIEL MAYNARD, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJennifer BeattieJustin Victor Kallal
AppellantJoe Bentley CongerJustin Victor Kallal
AppelleeDaniel MaynardGary T. Dance

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/06/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/06/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/06/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/06/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/12/2009Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
11/12/2009Memorandum - In support of motionMemorandumIn support of motionFinal
11/16/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Memorandum in Support of Motionto Dismiss AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/01/2009Order - Dismiss - involuntaryOrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
12/17/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal