judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RASHID A. SHITTU V. AMERICAN UNIVERSITY

Case Information: 11-AA-0252
Short Caption:RASHID A. SHITTU V. AMERICAN UNIVERSITYClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES00138-11Filed Date:03/03/2011

Opening Event Date:03/03/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/22/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/30/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/22/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/23/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerRashid A. Shittu YPro SeN
RespondentAmerican UniversityN
Hisham Khalid NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/03/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
03/03/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
03/23/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to March 3, 2011. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (ETW) FURTHER ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). (ETW)
03/23/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
04/12/2011APPEARANCE- of Hisham Khalid on behalf of respondent
07/22/2011FiledRecord On Appeal w/transcripts & exhibits
07/22/2011FiledRecord Completed
07/29/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/02/2011LodgedMotion To Reconsideration for Unemployment Benefits (Petitioner)
09/08/2011FiledMotion for Leave to File Pro Se Brief (Petitioner)Granted
10/03/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File Pro Se Brief & Appendix
10/03/2011FiledBrief (Petitioner)
10/03/2011FiledAppendix (Petitioner)
10/24/2011FiledOrder directing motion & brief
11/30/2011FiledOrder scheduling before merits division
11/30/2011FiledBriefing Completed
01/12/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/22/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, Beckwith, Ferren
03/30/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and Ferren, Senior Judge)
04/23/2012FiledMandate