judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

PACIFIC COAST ENGINEERING COMPANY v. TRINITY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC.

Case: B-2866
B-2866
07/16/1971
Application for Writ of Error
PACIFIC COAST ENGINEERING COMPANY
TRINITY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/18/1972Motion for RehearingRespondent
08/20/1971Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
08/13/1971Response to Brief filedRespondent
07/30/1971Response to Brief filedPetitioner
07/28/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
07/16/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
07/16/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/22/1972Response to Motion filed
05/18/1972Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/03/1972Opinion issued
10/13/1971Document received (See Remarks)
10/13/1971Document received (See Remarks)
10/13/1971Document received (See Remarks)
10/13/1971Document received (See Remarks)
10/13/1971Document received (See Remarks)
10/13/1971Document received (See Remarks)
08/20/1971Supplemental Brief filed
08/13/1971Response to Brief filed
08/05/1971Motion to amend application for writ of error
07/30/1971Response to Brief filed
07/28/1971Response to Petition
07/16/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/16/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/16/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Pacific Coast Engineering CompanyPetitioner
Trinity Construction Company, Inc.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information