judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MAINOR VS. AMERICAN GUARANTEE

Case Information: 38385
Short Caption:MAINOR VS. AMERICAN GUARANTEECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A402056Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/06/2001 / Segel, M.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:01/13/2003 at 11:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:01/13/2003How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/27/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Harrison Kemp & Jones, Chtd.--check no. 23905.
08/27/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14446
09/06/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: M. Nelson Segel. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/14/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-15552
09/18/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. M. Nelson Segel.
12/10/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 19, 2001. 01-20668
12/24/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-21656
01/16/2002Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 02-01063
01/30/2002Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 02-01968
05/20/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 05/15/02. 02-08831
05/20/2002AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 3. 02-08832
06/17/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Returned Unfiled Respondent American Guarantee and Liabilty Insurance Company's Answering Brief. Corrected brief due: 10 days.
06/17/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Supplement to Joint Appendix Volume III. 02-10438
06/24/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 06/20/02. 02-10872
07/19/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 07/17/02. 02-12381
11/27/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on January 13, 2003, at 11:00 a.m. (NNP03-RR/WM/MG)
12/24/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
01/13/2003Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP03-RR/WM/MG
03/04/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn4[We reject Mainor & Harris's claim that coverage extends to the suit as a matter of law under American's coverage for actions taken in a "fiduciary" capacity. It is not alleged and no contention is made that Mainor & Hjarris's representation of the personal injury plaintiffs arose from services as an "administrator, conservator, receiver, executor, guardina, trustee, or in any similar fiduciary capacity . . . . " We also note that the "Prior Acts Exclusion" was limited in scope and must be construed accordingly.] NNP03-RR/WM/MG 03-03534
03/21/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100 from Alverson, Taylor - check no. 42791.
03/21/2003Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Mailed on: March 20, 2003. 03-04897
04/21/2003Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). NNP03-RR/WM/MG 03-06698
05/02/2003Filing Fee Returned Filing Fee. Check No. 43788 returned to Law Offices of Alverson, Taylor, Mortensen, Nelson & Sanders.
05/02/2003Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Respondent American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company's Petition for Rehearing En Banc. Mailed on: UPS 5/1/03. 03-07437
05/16/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-06775
05/16/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/21/2003Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC 03-08601
05/27/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 19, 2003. 03-06775