judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHRISTOPHER RAY COUNTS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0160)
Case Number:S-11-0160Case Docketed On:07/11/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:CHRISTOPHER RAY COUNTS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CHRISTOPHER RAY COUNTS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantChristopher Ray CountsDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
D. Michael Pauling
Meri Vania Geringer
David L. Delicath

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Constitutional Law, Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence, Evidence
Opinion Number:2012 WY 70
Citation:277 P.3d 94

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/11/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/11/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/11/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/23/2011Motion - Supplemental briefing (Certificate of service indicates mailed August 18th, envelope postmarked August 22nd)MotionSupplemental briefingFinal
08/24/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/24/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/25/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/07/2011Order - Denying Motion to File Pro Se Supplemental BriefOrderDenyFinal
09/30/2011Motion - Other - Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Pro Se Brief (Second Request)MotionOtherFinal
10/11/2011Order - Supplemental briefing - deny - order denying motion to file pro se supplemental briefOrderSupplemental briefing - denyFinal
10/13/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/13/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/31/2011Notice-Incoming - Other - Received copy of District Court pleading from Appellant. No action necessaryNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
11/30/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/01/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/07/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
12/12/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric Alden for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/13/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Meri Geringer for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/20/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/28/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
12/28/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, seven volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III-V, Transcripts; Volume VI, Confidential Folder; Volume VII, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/12/2012Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Eric M. Alden, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Meri Vania Geringer, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
01/12/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/22/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/07/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/07/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/07/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/07/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/11/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 6/8/12.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
02/12/2015Correspondence - Incoming - received letter requesting information re: 2nd filed Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Pro se Brief. Responded in letter and provided courtesy copy of Order Denying second motion.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal