judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WASHINGTON GAS LIGHT CO. V. D.C. DEP'T OF TRANSPORTATION

Case Information: 11-AA-0253
Short Caption:WASHINGTON GAS LIGHT CO. V. D.C. DEP'T OF TRANSPORTATIONClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Dept of Transportation
Lead:11-AA-0253Consolidated: 11-AA-0463
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DTVM101807-08Filed Date:03/03/2011

Opening Event Date:03/03/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/04/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerWashington Gas Light CompanyN
L. Edward FunkNN
RespondentD.C. Dep't of TransportationN
Todd S. KimNY
Andrew Van BriskerNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/03/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
03/03/2011FILING FEE of $100.00.
03/03/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Todd Kim, Esq.
03/23/2011 On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
01/30/2012FiledMotion to Hold Proceedings and Briefing in Abeyance so that Parties can Discuss Settlement. (Respondent)Granted
02/09/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion To Stay Appeal
02/17/2012FiledRecord On Appeal
03/02/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte Consolidating Appeals - 11-AA-253 & 11-AA-463
03/07/2012FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Respondent)
03/07/2012FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal 11-AA-253 (Respondent)Granted
03/13/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion To Dismiss (Respondent)
03/13/2012FiledDismissed
04/04/2012FiledMandate