Case Information: 09-FM-0966 | |||
Short Caption: | MONTANA MARIE RAY V. JEFF TATE | Classification: | Appeals - Family - Domestic Violence |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CPO1943-09 | Filed Date: | 08/07/2009 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 08/07/2009 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 11/16/2009 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 05/06/2010 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 11/10/2010 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 12/09/2010 |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Montana Marie Ray | N |
| |||||||||
Appellee | Jeff Tate | N | Pro Se | N |
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
08/07/2009 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
08/24/2009 | On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on August 7, 2009, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (GP) | |||
10/02/2009 | ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW) | |||
10/02/2009 | DISMISSED | |||
10/05/2009 | RECEIVED - #1 (86 pgs/tape---7/13/09 proc) w/CD. | |||
10/06/2009 | RECEIVED - Record Index. | |||
10/26/2009 | MANDATE ISSUED | |||
10/27/2009 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL | |||
11/16/2009 | ORDER GRANT APPELLANT MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL sua sponte, that the mandate issued by this court on October 26, 2009 is hereby recalled. It is (MORE) | |||
11/16/2009 | ORDER SUA SPONTE REINSTATING APPEAL | |||
11/16/2009 | F/O that the Clerk shall file the record index and the July 13, 2009 transcript, it is F/O that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (ETW) | |||
11/16/2009 | RECORD INDEX | |||
11/16/2009 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (7/13/09 transcript w/CD - 86 pgs.) | |||
11/16/2009 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
12/23/2009 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 40 days | |||
01/07/2010 | On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before February 8, 2010. (GP) | |||
02/12/2010 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF (Counsel for Oral Argument requires pro hac vice approval) | |||
02/12/2010 | APPENDIX | |||
03/24/2010 | It appearing that the brief of appellant was filed with this court on February 12, 2010, and it further appearing that the brief of appellee was due to be filed on or before March 19, 2010, (See D.C. App. R. 31), but the brief has not been filed, it is ORDERED that appellee shall within 20 days from the date of this order submit the brief, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the brief, or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to being scheduled for consideration on the record and on appellant's brief without further notice. (GP) | |||
05/06/2010 | On consideration of this court's order of March 24, 2010, which directed appellee to submit his brief within 20 days from the date of the order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, but it appearing that the brief has not yet filed, it is ORDERED that this appeal shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division of this court on the record and on appellant's brief alone. (ETW) | |||
05/06/2010 | BRIEFS COMPLETED | |||
05/18/2010 | FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I | |||
09/30/2010 | CALENDAR NOTICE SENT | |||
11/10/2010 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
11/10/2010 | SUBMITTED to Judges Reid, Glickman, Newman | |||
11/17/2010 | REVERSED MOJ (Reid, Glickman, Newman) | |||
12/09/2010 | MANDATE ISSUED | |||
04/23/2014 | Filed | Archived |