judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KENNETH G. COPELAND V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 07-CO-1451
Short Caption:KENNETH G. COPELAND V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL3905-94Filed Date:12/26/2007

Opening Event Date:12/26/2007Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/27/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/01/2011
Argued/Submitted:01/18/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/17/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKenneth G. Copeland YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Kristina L. AmentYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/26/2007NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/27/2010RECORD COPIES
04/27/2010RECORD INDEX
04/27/2010RECORD COMPLETED
05/04/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: GP)
06/23/2010 On consideration of this court's order of May 4, 2010, directing appellant to file the brief, and the limited appendix, as required by D.C.App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the limited appendix have not been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (GP)
07/02/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF due to transfer to new facility.
07/27/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
08/10/2010CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED from Appellant: Kenneth G. Copeland Fed. # 18626-016 Atlanta U.S.P. P.O. Box 105160 Atlanta, GA 30315
09/08/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF (NO Appendix attached).
09/28/2010 It appearing that the brief of appellant, was filed with this court on September 8, 2010, and it further appearing that the limited appendix has not been filed, (See D.C. App. r. 30, 31.), it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the app endix or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date the appendix is filed with this court. (Castillo)
11/02/2010APPENDIX to Appellant's Brief. (Served by: DCCA on 11/2/10).
11/30/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
12/01/2010TMC - appellee's motion to dismiss
12/17/2010LETTER from Appellant regarding service of mail to Appellant.
12/28/2010 ORDERED that the MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED and this APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED as having been UNTIMELY FILED, but W/O PREJUDICE to appellant seeking an extension of time in Superior Court on the ground of excusable neglect, and if granted, to filing a motion to reinstate the appeal in this court. See DC App. R. 4(a)(5). (RZTEFA) (jl)
12/28/2010DISMISSED
01/21/2011MANDATE ISSUED
05/11/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL
05/12/2011TMC - motion to reinstate
05/31/2011ORDER GRANT APPELLANT MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL AND the Clerk shall recall the mandate and this appeal is HEREBY REINSTATED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the BRIEF OF APPELLEE shall be filed w/n 30 days. (RZTEFA)
06/13/2011MANDATE RECALLED
06/27/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 30 days.
07/21/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief
08/01/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
08/01/2011FiledBriefing Completed
08/19/2011FiledReply Brief (Titled Appellant's Opposition to the Government's Brief) (Appellant)
09/23/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
11/30/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/18/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Glickman, Thompson, Belson
03/07/2012FiledMiscellaneous Transcripts submitted to the Court from USAO as requested by this Court (Appellee)
03/14/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Belson, Senior Judge.)
04/06/2012WithdrawnMandate **RECALLED**
04/10/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
07/09/2012FiledORDERED, sua sponte, that the mandate issued by this court on April 6, 2012, is hereby recalled.
07/09/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's pro se petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc.
07/17/2012FiledMandate
08/21/2012FiledMotion To Recall The Mandate (Appellant)
08/24/2012FiledTMC//MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE
04/23/2013FiledOrder Denying Motion to recall Mandate