judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ORMOND (WILLIE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38390
Short Caption:ORMOND (WILLIE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 43280 , 45260
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C169874Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:GibbonsCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Agosti for Justice GibbonsPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/24/2003How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/28/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/28/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-14541
10/23/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. If appellant is indigent, the district court shall have 30 days within which to appoint counsel for appellant. Otherwise, the district court shall order that, within 30 days, appellant must retain counsel and counsel must enter an appearance in the district court. Within 5 days from appointment or appearance of counsel the district court clerk shall transmit to this court a copy of the district court's written or minute order, and serve a copy of this order on appellant's counsel. Thereafter, counsel shall have 10 days to file a notice of appearance in this court. fn1[All filing deadlines shall commence to run from the date on which counsel is required to enter an appearance in this court.] 01-17830
11/13/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appointment of Counsel. Certified copy of notice from Clark County Clerk filed in district court on 11/9/01 enclosing a copy of minute order. Christopher Orem appointed as counsel for appellant on 11/6/01. 01-18901
01/23/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On November 9, 2001, the district court filed a "Notice of Appointment of Counsel." The notice was pursuant to a minute order appointing attorney Christopher Oram as counsel for appellant. Mr. Oram was required to file a notice of appearance in this court by November 26, 2001. The docketing statement and either a transcript request form or a certificate indicating that no transcripts are requested were due to be filed by December 11, 2001. To date, the required document shave not been filed. Mr. Oram shall file the notice of appearance within 10 days from the date of this order. Within the same time period, appellant shall file and serve the docketing statement and either a transcript request form or a certificate indicating that no transcripts are requested, or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 02-01500
02/04/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Christopher Oram. 02-02215
02/06/2002Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 02-02397
02/06/2002Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/22/01. To Court Reporter: Patsy Smith. 02-02398
02/06/2002Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/24/01. To Court Reporter: Cathy Nelson. 02-02400
06/03/2002MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: July 2, 2002. 02-09595
07/02/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Second request) 02-11332
07/05/2002Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed July 2, 2002. Appellant shall have until August 1, 2002, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. 02-11434
08/01/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-13185
08/14/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed August 1, 2002. Appellant shall have 50 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Because appellant has indicated that he does not need the transcript requested of court reporter Patsy Smith, we conclude that Ms. Smith does not need to file the requested transcript. Court recorder Cathy Nelson, however, shall have 20 days from the date of this order to prepare and file the transcript of "Sentencing Counts II & V." fn1[We note that although appellant identified the sentencing date as July 24, 2001, in the transcript request form, the district court docket entries indicate that sentencing of these counts actually occurred on June 11, 2001.] If more time is needed to complete the transcript, Ms. Nelson shall, within the same time period, file a motion requesting an extension of time or if the requested transcript cannot be produced, notify this court, in writing, of this fact. 02-13886
10/04/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on Fed-Ex 10/3/02. 02-17177
10/04/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 02-17178
10/09/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 24, 2001. Court Reporter: Cat Nelson. 02-17481
10/31/2002Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: June 11, 2001. To Court Reporter: Patsy Smith. 02-18784
11/07/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express Mail - No postmark. 02-19190
11/12/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 11, 2001. Court Reporter: Patsy K. Smith. 02-19396
12/05/2002MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: January 7, 2003. 02-20847
01/08/2003BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 01/08/03. 03-00384
01/16/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. to Reply Brief filed on 01/08/03. Attached to inside back cover of original and copies of brief. 03-00858
01/24/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 03-01315
01/24/2003Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/25/2003OtherDisqualification of Justice Gibbons. Sat in district court proceedings.
07/22/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter and conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP03-DA/RR/WM 03-12360
08/19/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-12746
08/19/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/28/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 25, 2003. 03-12746