judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PINE GLADES DEVELOPMENT, LLC v. SULLIVAN CONSTRUCTION, LLC

Case Heading (S-09-0240)
Case Number:S-09-0240Case Docketed On:11/12/2009
Linked To: S-09-0239
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Liens (Title 29)
Short Title:PINE GLADES DEVELOPMENT, LLC v. SULLIVAN CONSTRUCTION, LLC
Full Title:PINE GLADES DEVELOPMENT, LLC, Appellant (Petitioner), v. SULLIVAN CONSTRUCTION, LLC, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPine Glades Development, LLCGlenn Martin Ford
Glenn W. Myers
Molly Hartman Dearing
AppelleeSullivan Construction, LLCMark Diehl Sullivan

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/12/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/12/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/12/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/12/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/29/2009Motion - Stay - bankruptcyMotionStay - bankruptcyFinal
12/30/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Stay Due to BankruptcyEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/13/2010Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
01/15/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Answer to Appellee's Motion to Stay Due to BankruptcyEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
01/20/2010Order - Stay briefing Pending Ruling by Bankruptcy CourtOrderStay briefingFinal
02/19/2010System - Status check - bankruptcy. Contacted counsel for appellant. He indicated a hearing is set for March 10, 2010, and the motion to lift stay will be part of that hearing. He will keep the court informed.SystemStatus check - bankruptcyFinal
03/18/2010Motion - Dismiss - stipulatedMotionDismiss - stipulatedFinal
03/23/2010Event - Hardcopy received Motion to Dismiss Appeals and Joint Stipulation for Dismissal with PrejudiceEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/23/2010Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
03/23/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal