judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MATTHEW TAYLOR V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0260
Short Caption:MATTHEW TAYLOR V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM1913-10Filed Date:02/28/2011

Opening Event Date:02/28/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/24/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/04/2011
Argued/Submitted:01/25/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/21/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMatthew Taylor Y
Gaillard T. HuntYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Sean M. Lewis YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/28/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/16/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Gaillard Hunt, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
03/16/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Gaillard Hunt, Esquire
03/23/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) w/motion for appeal transcript attached (rt ordered/needed)dfe
05/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (7pgs/Tape) 8/18/10 proc.
05/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (7pgs/Tape) 9/10/10 proc.
05/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (4pgs/Tape) 9/23/10 proc.
05/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (6pgs/Tape) 11/2/10 proc.
05/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (8pgs/Tape) 12/6/10 proc.
05/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (7pgs/Tape) 2/4/11 proc. (I)
05/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (69pgs/Henderson for Graybill) 2/4/11 proc. w/CD
05/24/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/25/2011RECORD INDEX
05/25/2011RECORD COPIES
05/27/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
06/30/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
06/30/2011APPENDIX to Appellant's Brief.
08/04/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
08/04/2011FiledBriefing Completed
08/22/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
09/23/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
11/30/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/25/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Washington, Blackburne-Rigsby, Pryor
07/30/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judge, and Pryor, Senior Judge)
08/17/2012FiledNotice Received re:options (Appellant)
08/21/2012FiledMandate