judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

INGEBRETSEN (JOHN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38391
Short Caption:INGEBRETSEN (JOHN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 43051 , 43843 , 47114 , 53464 , 58863
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C175709Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/28/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/28/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 01-14544
09/06/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 6/4/01, 8/8/01, 8/15/01. Court Reporter: Dina Dalton. Filed in district court on: August 31, 2001. 01-15036
10/09/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-16990
10/31/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed October 9, 2001. Court reporter or recorder Dina Dalton shall file the requested transcripts within 10 days of this order or show cause why she should not be sanctioned. The fast track statement and appendix shall be filed and served within 30 days of this order. 01-18210
11/08/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-18646
11/27/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed November 8, 2001. Counsel for appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. 01-19819
12/03/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-20172
12/03/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-20173
12/26/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-21712
01/04/2002Order/Procedural Order. To date, this court has not received certified copies of the requested transcripts. Accordingly, court reporter Dina Dalton shall deliver certified copies of the requested rough draft transcripts to the clerk of this court within 10 days of the date of this order or show cause why she should not be sanctioned. 02-00193
01/23/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-01590
02/19/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-02024
02/19/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/08/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 21, 2002. 02-02024