judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STANLEY BUDDER, JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0241)
Case Number:S-09-0241Case Docketed On:11/17/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:STANLEY BUDDER, JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:STANLEY BUDDER, JR., Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantStanley Budder Jr.Diane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Christyne M. Martens

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Jury Instructions
Opinion Number:2010 WY 123
Citation:238 P.3d 575

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/17/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/17/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/17/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/04/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/04/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/16/2010Notice-Incoming - Consent and ApprovalNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
02/16/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/17/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Consent and ApprovalEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/17/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/23/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
03/09/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/09/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
03/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
03/12/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, eight volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volumes III-VI, Transcripts; Volume VII, Confidential Folder; Volume VIII, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/30/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
08/31/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order - Affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/16/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/16/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/16/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/16/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/20/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 9/17/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal