Case: 05-94-01162-CV
05-94-01162-CV
07/28/1994
Mandamus
Jerome Melvin Naftalis, Relator
Lynn Skipworth Hunt, Judge, 160th District Court, Dallas Cou
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/20/2015 | Order entered | Destroy | | ||
09/02/2015 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
07/02/1997 | Retention time case file will be retained | Destroy | | ||
07/29/1994 | Order Entered | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
07/29/1994 | Order Entered | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
07/28/1994 | MattConv | | |||
07/28/1994 | Motion for Leave to File | | |||
07/28/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/20/2015 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
160th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Lynn Skipworth Hunt
90-06251-H