judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MULLINAX CONCRETE SERVICE CO., INC. v. MERLIN H. ZOWADA and LORI ZOWADA

Case Heading (S-09-0237)
Case Number:S-09-0237Case Docketed On:11/09/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Highways (Title 24)
Short Title:MULLINAX CONCRETE SERVICE CO., INC. v. MERLIN H. ZOWADA and LORI ZOWADA
Full Title:MULLINAX CONCRETE SERVICE CO., INC., Appellant (Petitioner), v. MERLIN H. ZOWADA and LORI ZOWADA, Appellees (Petitioners).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMullinax Concrete Service Company, Inc.Anthony Todd Wendtland
AppelleeMerlin H. ZowadaH.W. Rasmussen
AppelleeLori ZowadaH.W. Rasmussen

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Roads
Opinion Number:2010 WY 146
Citation:243 P.3d 181

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/09/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/09/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/09/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/09/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/23/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/23/2009Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
12/28/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Opening Brief of Appellant, Mullinax Concrete Service Company, Inc., Appellant's Statement of Costs and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/04/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/05/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellees Merlin H. and Lori ZowadaEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/11/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/17/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
02/18/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Anthony Wendtland for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - H. W. Rasmussen for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant, Mullinax Concrete Service Company, Inc.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/25/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/25/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three boxes. Box #1 contains Volume I, Original Papers in District Court Case # CV2009-63, Volume II, Original Papers in District Court Case # CV2009-67, and Agency Record Volumes I-II; Box # 2 contains Agency Record Volumes III-VI; Box # 3 contains Agency Record Volumes VII-X.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/25/2010Event - Phone Call - Called Kim at Clerk's Office to inquire into why three folders were included with the record that weren't indexed or page numbered. She stated they were with the Agency Record and assumed they were part of Agency Record. Told her we would leave the folders with the record and will return them with mandate.EventPhone CallFinal
02/25/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/16/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Anthony Todd Wendtland for appellant; H.W. Rasmussen for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/16/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
11/10/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, but remanding for further proceedings, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/30/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/30/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/30/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/30/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/02/2010Service - Certified mail signature return cards (3). Record signed for 12/1/2010.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal