judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARKUS JAHR V. DC DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS., ET AL

Case Information: 11-AA-0255
Short Caption:MARKUS JAHR V. DC DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS., ET ALClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Worker's Compensation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CRB111-10Filed Date:03/04/2011

Opening Event Date:03/04/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/11/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/07/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerMarkus Jahr N
Richard J. LinkYN
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services - Worker's Comp.N
Todd S. KimNY
Andrew Van Brisker NN
RespondentDistrict of Columbia Fire & RescueN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/04/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
03/04/2011FILING FEE of $100.00.
03/04/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, Todd Kim, Esq. & Gregory Lamb, Esq.
04/11/2011RECORD ON APPEAL w/9/14/09hearing
04/11/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/14/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
05/23/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 30 days (no oppo)
06/01/2011 On consideration of petitioner's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before June 24, 2011. (JAC)
06/24/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF w/appendix
06/24/2011APPENDIX
07/22/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent D.C. Dept. of Employment Services - Worker's Comp.)
07/26/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent D.C. Dept. of Employment Services - Worker's Comp.) on or before September 27, 2011.
09/22/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File (Respondent District of Columbia Fire & Rescue)Granted
09/28/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File (Respondent District of Columbia Fire & Rescue)
11/07/2011FiledMotion To Stay Appeal (titled as consent motion to hold in abeyance) (Respondent D.C. Dept. of Employment Services - Worker's Comp.)Granted
11/17/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion To Stay Appeal
01/12/2012FiledStatement regarding first 60 day status report of the DOES (Respondent D.C. Dept. of Employment Services - Worker's Comp.)
03/19/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Statement/Status Report (Respondent D.C. Dept. of Employment Services - Worker's Comp.)Granted
04/11/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File Statement/Status Report (Respondent D.C. Dept. of Employment Services - Worker's Comp.)
04/11/2012FiledStatement regarding second 60 day status report of the DOES (Respondent D.C. Dept. of Employment Services - Worker's Comp.)
05/10/2012FiledStatement regarding status of settlement negotiations. (Respondent D.C. Dept. of Employment Services - Worker's Comp.)
07/02/2012FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal to dismiss appeal as moot because parties have reached an out of court settlement (Petitioner Jahr, Respondent D.C. Dept. of Employment Services - Worker's Comp .District of Columbia Fire & Rescue)
07/13/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion To Dismiss Appeal to dismiss appeal as moot because parties have reached an out of court settlement
07/13/2012FiledDismissed
08/07/2012FiledMandate