judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BEATTY VS. G.J.'S GENERAL CONTRACTORS

Case Information: 38387
Short Caption:BEATTY VS. G.J.'S GENERAL CONTRACTORSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A395237Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/05/2001 / Mishel, PersiSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/12/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/28/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Joel F. Hansen & Associates--check no. 3192.
08/28/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14516
09/05/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Persi J. Mishel. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/07/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on: August 23, 2001. 01-15166
09/17/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-15632
09/19/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Persi J. Mishel.
09/19/2001Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. 01-15819
09/21/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Persi J. Mishel.
11/13/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-18874
11/21/2001Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 01-19605
12/05/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 01-20323
03/25/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 03/21/02. Signed by: Joel F. Hansen. 02-05234
03/25/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 02-05235
04/23/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 04/23/02. Signed by: Jack G. Angaran. 02-07179
04/23/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 02-07180
05/02/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 04/30/02. Signed by: Joel F. Hansen. 02-07735
09/12/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. See NRAP 34(f)(1). 02-15849
09/12/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP03-MS/ML/NB
02/04/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP03-MS/ML/NB 03-01872
03/04/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-02070
03/04/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/17/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 6, 2003. 03-02070