judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MORAN VS. BONNEVILLE SQUARE

Case Information: 38381
Short Caption:MORAN VS. BONNEVILLE SQUARECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36433
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A355494Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/06/2001 / Segel, M.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/09/2003How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/27/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
08/27/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14423
08/27/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
08/31/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Kirk T. Kennedy -check no. 6686.
09/06/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: M. Nelson Segel. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/14/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-15560
09/14/2001MotionFiled Motion. Appellant's Motion to Remove Case from NRAP 16 Settlement Program. 01-15599
09/17/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Appellant Moran's Supplement to the Docketing Statement. 01-15717
09/18/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. M. Nelson Segel.
09/19/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. M. Nelson Segel.
09/24/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On September 14, 2001, appellant filed a motion to remove this appeal from the settlement conference program. Under NRAP 16(a), the settlement judge assigned to an appeal may recommend that the appeal be removed from the program. Thus, any request for removal must be directed to the settlement judge. We deny appellant's motion. 01-16069
12/24/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-21635
01/18/2002Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 02-01268
02/06/2002Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: March 21, 22, 23, and 24. To Court Reporter: Sharleen Nicholson. 02-02415
05/20/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: June 17, 2002. 02-08862
06/17/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-10457
07/10/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed June 17, 2002. Appellant shall have until September 16, 2002, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. No further extensions absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 02-11798
08/06/2002Order/Procedural Order. As of this date, Court Reporter Sharleen Nicholson has failed to file a copy of the transcripts with this court. Accordingly, the court reporter shall file the transcripts with the clerk of this court within 20 days of the date of this order. If more time is needed to complete the preparation of the transcript, Ms. Nicholson shall, within the same time period, file a motion requesting an extension of time and stating the reason for the extension. If the requested transcript cannot be produced, Ms. Nicholson, shall notify this court, in writing, of this fact. 02-13444
08/16/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to Prepare Transcript. 02-14069
08/19/2002MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Order of August 6, 2002. 02-14120
08/26/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed August 16, 2002. Court Reporter Sharleen Nicholson shall file the requested transcripts within 60 days from the date of this order. In light of this order, appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix within 90 days from the date of this order. 02-14584
11/22/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 3/21/00; 3/22/00; 3/23/00; 3/24/00; and 3/27/00. Court Reporter: Alice Eastgate. 02-20190
11/25/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on 11/21/02. 02-20243
11/25/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 02-20244
12/23/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: January 23, 2003. 02-21975
01/17/2003BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent Amtech Elevator Service's Answering Brief. Mailed on: UPS 01/16/03. 03-00955
01/24/2003BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent B. Max, Inc's. Answering Brief. Mailed on: 01/15/03. 03-01359
01/24/2003BriefFiled Joinder to Brief. Respondent Bonneville Square Associates Joinder in Respondents' Amtech Elevator Services and B. Max, Inc's. Answering Brief. 03-01360
03/03/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Respondent's B. Max's Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. 03-03491
03/05/2003Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. as Moot. On January 24, 2003, this court received the answering brief of respondent B. Max, Inc. Because the brief was mailed to this court on January 15, 2003, it was timely submitted and was thus filed. Accordingly, we deny as moot, respondent B. Max Inc.'s March 3, 2003, motion for a one-day extension of time to file the answering brief. 03-03611
03/06/2003Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
07/09/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 03-11457
07/09/2003Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/19/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP03-MS/ML/NB 03-13831
09/16/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-13949
09/16/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/24/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 19, 2003. 03-13949