judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION DRIVER'S LICENSE ACTION INVOLVING: BRADY L. MICHAELS, LICENSEE v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex. rel., DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Case Heading (S-11-0156)
Case Number:S-11-0156Case Docketed On:06/23/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Big Horn CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Highways (Title 24)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION DRIVER'S LICENSE ACTION INVOLVING: BRADY L. MICHAELS, LICENSEE v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex. rel., DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION DRIVER'S LICENSE ACTION INVOLVING: BRADY L. MICHAELS, LICENSEE, Appellant (Petitioner). v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex. rel., DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBrady L. MichaelsDonna D. Domonkos
AppelleeDepartment of TransportationGregory A. Phillips
Donna A. Murray
Douglas J. Moench
Robin Sessions Cooley

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Criminal Law -DUI
Opinion Number:2012 WY 33
Citation:271 P.3d 1003 (Wyo. 2012)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/23/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/23/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/23/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/23/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/10/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/12/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant Brady L. Michaels; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/27/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/27/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, State of Wyoming, ex rel., Department of Transportation; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/03/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
10/17/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/17/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/17/2011Motion - Supplement the recordMotionSupplement the recordFinal
10/17/2011Event - Hardcopy received - reply brief of appellant.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/17/2011Event - Hardcopy received - appellant's motion to supplement the record.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/18/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
10/25/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
10/25/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcript; Volume III, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/15/2011Order - Granting Motion to Supplement RecordOrderGrantFinal
03/06/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Kite writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/21/2012Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
03/21/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's petition to reconsider and brief of appellant Brady L. MichaelsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/03/2012Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
04/03/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/03/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/03/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/06/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 4/5/12.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal