judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DARNELL N. ANDERSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0281
Short Caption:DARNELL N. ANDERSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Lead: 11-CF-0106 Consolidated: 11-CF-0162 , 11-CF-0281, 11-CF-0745
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-20672-09Filed Date:03/04/2011

Opening Event Date:03/04/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:10/03/2012Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/15/2014
Argued/Submitted:02/12/2015
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/15/2015
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDarnell N. Anderson Y
Jason M. KnottYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/04/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/23/2011ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeal no. 11-CF-281 is consolidated with previously consolidated appeals nos. 11-CF-106 and 11-CF-162 for all purposes herin. F/O/ that William Taylor, Esquire and Jason Knott, Esquire, are hereby assigned as pro bono counsel representing appellant Darnell N. Anderson in appeal no. 11-CF-281. F/O that counsel for appellant Darnell N. Anderson shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes,appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
04/21/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (11-CF-281) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
07/19/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Consolidating Appeals nos. 11-CF-745, 11-CF-106, 11-CF-162 and 11-CF-281. Appointing Thomas Paynter, Esquire to 11-CF-745 and directing Statement Regarding Transcript in appeal no. 11-CF-745.
07/19/2011FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw (Appellant)Granted
08/15/2011FiledORDER GRANT - Withdraw Appointed Counsel Jonathan Zucker, Esquire, and appointing Thomas Heslep, Esquire to appeal no. 11-CF-106.
08/30/2011FiledOrder directing appellant James Charlie Bates to submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion w/in 15 days.
09/20/2011LodgedReceived pro se letter regarding lack of communication from court-appointed counsel. (Appellant)
09/21/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File Statement Regarding Transcript (Appellant)
09/29/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave of appellant James Bates to file the lodged statement regarding transcript.
09/29/2011FiledStatement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant)
11/01/2011FiledLetter To counsel for appellant referring the pro se letter received from appellant on September 20.
01/10/2012FiledMotion and affidavit for leave to file an interim voucher (Bates) (Appellant)Granted
01/25/2012LodgedLetter regarding lack of communication from court-appointed counsel From (Appellant)
02/10/2012FiledORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SUBMIT INTERIM VOUCHERS (11CF745)
04/19/2012FiledLetter From Appellant requesting the removal of counsel Thomas Paytner from appellate case (Appellant)
04/27/2012FiledLetter To Attorney for appellant regarding letter from his client requesting new counsel.
05/21/2012FiledLetter From appellant's attorney re: April 27. 2012 letter from court (Appellant) Bates
05/21/2012FiledMotion and affidavit for funding to copy and ship transcript to appellant (Appellant)Denied
06/18/2012FiledORDER DENYING COUNSEL'S (11CF745) MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO BILL FOR COPYING AND MAILING OF ALL TRIAL TRANSCRIPT
07/20/2012FiledMotion to amend statement regarding transcript. (Bates) (Appellant)Granted
08/02/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion to file lodged amend statement regarding transcript. (Bates) (Appellant)
08/02/2012FiledAmended Statement Regarding Transcript(s) Appellant (Bates)
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #1 (31 pgs/tape) 12/21/09 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #2 (27 pgs/Hunt) 2/12/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #3 (12 pgs//Richer) 4/2/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #4 (21 pgs/McCarn) 5/21/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #5 (55 pgs/McCarn) 6/30/10 proc
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #6 (6 pgs/Gilliam) 7/9/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #7 (40 pgs/Wood) 7/30/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #8 (10 pgs/Hunt) 8/4/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #9 (236 pgs/Maar) 8/23/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #10 (220 pgs/Maar) 8/24/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #11 (89 pgs/Maar) 8/25/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #12 (107 pgs/Maar) 8/27/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #13 (8 pgs/Richer) 8/30/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #14 (172 pgs/Wood) 8/31/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #15 (143 pgs/Richer) 9/1/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #16 (126 pgs/Wood) 9/2/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #17 (102 pgs/Richer) 9/3/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #18 (116 pgs/Richer) 9/7/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #19 (125 pgs/Wood) 9/7/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #20 (135 pgs/Richer) 9/8/10 proc. a.m.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #21 (89 pgs/Wood) 9/8/10 proc p.m.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #22 (44 pgs/Richer) 9/10/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #23 (144 pgs/Davis) 9/13/10 proc
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #24 (103 pgs/Gilliam) 9/13/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #25 (112 pgs/Gilliam) 9/14/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #26 pgs/Davis) 9/14/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #27 (95 pgs/Davis) 9/15/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #28 (122 pgs/Gilliam) 9/15/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #29 (142 pgs/Gilliam) 9/16/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #30 (8 pgs/Davis) 9/16/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #31 (87 pgs/Davis) 9/20/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #32 (137 pgs/Gilliam) 9/20/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #33 (87 pgs/Gilliam) 9/21/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #34 (121 pgs/Davis) 9/21/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #35 (94 pgs/Davis) 9/22/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #36 (108 pgs/Gilliam) 9/22/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #37 (98 pgs/Gilliam) 9/23/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #38 (150 pgs/Davis) 9/23/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #39 (150 pgs/Davis) 9/24/10 proc
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #40 (118 pgs/Ott) 9/27/10 proc
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #41 (111 pgs/Jeon) 9/27/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #42 (127 pgs/Jeon) 9/28/10 proc. a.m.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #43 (115 pgs/Ott) 9/28/10 proc. p.m.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #44 (114 pgs/Ott) 9/30/10 proc. a.m.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #45 (136 pgs/Jeon) 9/30/10 proc. p.m.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #46 (56 pgs/Jeon) 10/1/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #47 (123 pgs/Jeon) 10/4/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #48 (113 pgs/Ott) 10/4/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #49 (119 pgs/Ott) 10/5/10 proc
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #50 (114 pgs/Jeon) 10/5/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #51 (138 pgs/Jeon) 10/6/10 proc. a.m.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - ##52 (90 pgs/Ott) 10/6/10 proc. p.m.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #53 (43 pgs/Ott) 10/7/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #54 (76 pgs/Maar) 10/13/10 proc. a.m.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #55 (143 pgs/Davis) 10/13/10 proc p.m.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #56 (108 pgs/Davis) 10/14/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #57 (95 pgs/Maar) 10/14/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #58 (166 pgs/Maar) 10/15/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #59 (113 pgs/Maar) 10/18/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #60 (134 pgs/Davis) 10/18/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #61 (140 pgs/Davis) 10/19/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #62 (109 pgs/Maar) 10/19/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #63 (141 pgs/Maar) 10/20/10 proc. a.m.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #64 (144 pgs/Davis) 10/20/10 proc. p.m.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #65 (204 pgs/Maar) 10/21/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #66 (203 pgs/Davis) 10/22/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #67 (108 pgs/Davis) 10/25/10 proc. a.m.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #68 (132 pgs/Maar) 10/25/10 proc. p.m.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #69 (111 pgs/Maar) 10/26/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #70 (92 pgs/Davis) 10/26/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #71 (113 pgs/Davis) 10/27/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #72 (152 pgs/Maar) 10/27/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #73 (71 pgs/Maar) 10/28/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify -#74 (11 pgs/Davis) 10/29/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #75 (33 pgs/Richer) 11/1-4/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #76 (9 pgs/Henderson) 11/8/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #77 (6 pgs/ Henderson) 11/9/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #78 (7 pgs/Henderson) 11/10/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #79 (75 pgs/Henderson) 11/12/10 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #80 (14 pgs/Gilliam) 1/12/11 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #81 (18 pgs/Hunt) 2/11/11 proc.
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #82 (11 pgs/Rogers) 5/25/11 proc. w/cd
10/02/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #83 (SEALED orders)
10/03/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #84 (SEALED orders)
10/03/2012FiledRecord Completed
10/03/2012FiledRecord Copies (11-cf-106)
10/03/2012FiledRecord Index (11-cf-106)
10/04/2012FiledRecord Copies (11-CF-162)
10/04/2012FiledRecord Index (11-CF-162)
10/17/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #85 (SEALED pleadings)
10/17/2012FiledRecord Copies (11-CF-281)
10/17/2012FiledRecord Index (11-CF-281)
10/25/2012FiledBriefing Order
10/26/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #86 (SEALED documents)
10/26/2012FiledRecord Copies (11-CF-745)
10/26/2012FiledRecord Index (11-CF-745)
11/08/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief until February 4,2013 (Warren) (Appellant)Granted
11/13/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief until February 4,2013 (Warren) (Appellant)
11/16/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File (Jenkins, Anderson & Bates) Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
12/10/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Joint Motion For Extension Of Time to File (Jenkins, Anderson & Bates) Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 2/4/13
01/22/2013FiledLetter From Appellant requesting the dismassal of counsel (Appellant)
01/24/2013FiledLetter To Thomas Heslep, Esq. re: client's submissions to court
01/24/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File (joint) Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
01/29/2013FiledLetter From Appellant regarding transcript requests from his counsel (Appellant)
02/01/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File (joint) Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 3/6/13.
03/05/2013FiledBrief (Warren) (Appellant)
03/05/2013FiledAppendix (Appellant)
03/05/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File (Jenkins) Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
03/07/2013FiledBrief (Anderson) (Appellant)
03/07/2013FiledAppendix (Appellant)
03/07/2013FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (Anderson) (Appellant)Granted
03/11/2013FiledMotion For Leave to File motion to hold appeal in abeyance. (Bates) Other (Appellant)Granted
03/27/2013FiledCorrection to the Motion to hold appeal in abeyance to allow completion of section 23-110 motion to vacate (Appellant-Bates)
04/05/2013FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave and the Clerk shall File the lodged motion to hold appeal in abeyance. (Bates) (Appellant) and appellant Bates shall advise this court on 7/1/13, as to the status of the motion in the trial court.
04/05/2013FiledMotion to hold appeal in abeyance. (Appellant)Held in Abeyance
04/05/2013FiledOrder Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File (Jenkins) Appendix, Brief (Appellant ) and the Clerk shall file the lodged brief and limited appendix of appellant Jenkins.
04/05/2013FiledBrief (Jenkins) (Appellant)
04/05/2013FiledAppendix (Jenkins) (Appellant)
04/05/2013FiledOrder Granting Motion To Supplement The Record (Anderson) (Appellant) and the lodged transcripts will be forwarded to the Appeals Coordinator's Office for transmittal to this court as a supplemental record.
04/10/2013FiledSupplemental Record specify - #87 (sentencing transcripts 8/12/11 & 9/15/10, etc)
07/11/2013FiledMotion For Leave to File notice on status of 23-110 out of time Other (Appellant)Granted
07/12/2013FiledMotion by Jenkins, Warren & Anderson to sever their appeals from James Bates or in the alternative to deny Bates' requested stay (Appellant)Denied as Moot
07/30/2013FiledOrder Granting appellant James Bates' Motion For Leave to file the lodged status statement, denying appellant James Bates' motion to stay, denying as moot co-appellants to sever their appeals and directing the brief and limited appendix of appellant James Bates within 30 days from the date of this order and appellee's consolidated brief within 30 days thereafter
07/30/2013FiledNotice Received to court on status of 23-110 motion (Appellant)(Bate)
09/16/2013FiledMotion For Leave to File to file motion for extension of time to file brief. Other (Appellant) (Bates)
10/04/2013FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave and the Clerk shall file the motion for extension of time to file brief. Other (Appellant) (Bates). Appellant Bates' motion for extension of time is granted and the brief and limited appendix shall be filed on or before 11/27/13.
10/04/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)(Bates)Granted
12/17/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Bates) (Appellant)Granted
12/18/2013FiledResponse to co-appellant Bates' motion to extend time to file brief (Jenkins) (Appellant)
12/19/2013FiledMotion for interim compensation for CJA panel Attorney (Appellant)Denied as Moot
01/10/2014FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Bates) (Appellant) and the brief and limited appendix due w/n 30 days from date of order. Motion for interim compensation for CJA panel Attorney (Appellant) (Warren) is DENIED AS MOOT, and a copy of this court's order of 2/10/12, that permitted filing of interim vouchers from all appellants is included w/this order.
02/20/2014FiledMotion For Leave to File (Bates) Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
02/25/2014FiledLetter From Appellant in regards to court appointed counsel (Appellant)
02/25/2014FiledLetter To counsel regarding appellant's 2/25/14 letter
02/26/2014FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File (Bates) Appendix, Brief (Appellant) and brief of appellee due w/n 30 days.
02/26/2014FiledAppendix (Appellant)
02/26/2014FiledBrief (Appellant Bates)
03/24/2014FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
03/27/2014FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 6/26/14
06/24/2014FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
07/02/2014FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 8/14/12
08/11/2014FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (Appellee)Granted
08/11/2014FiledMotion To File Excess-Paged Brief (Appellee)Granted
08/14/2014FiledTMC//MOTION TO FILE BRIEF lodge BRIEF IN EXCESS PAGES//MOTION TO SUPP REC
08/15/2014FiledORDER GRANTING APPELLEE'S MOTIONS and the CLERK SHALL FILE APPELLEE'S lodged BRIEF and the documents attached to the Motion to Supp as a Supplemental Record...
08/15/2014FiledBrief (Appellee)
08/15/2014FiledSupplemental Record #88 (Proposed Theory of Case Instruction)
08/15/2014FiledBriefing Completed
08/15/2014FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant) allGranted
08/21/2014FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant) (Joint) to 11/4/14
11/03/2014FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
11/04/2014FiledReply Brief (Bates) (Appellant)
11/04/2014FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
11/04/2014FiledReply Brief (Anderson) (Appellant)
11/04/2014FiledReply Brief (Warren) (Appellant)
11/12/2014FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
01/02/2015FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/12/2015FiledMotion for additional time for oral argument (Appellant)Granted
02/12/2015FiledArgued Before Chief Judge Washington, Senior Judge Pryor, Senior Judge Farrell(Thomas T. Heslep Esq., Jason M. Knott Esq., Gregory S. Smith Esq.,Thomas Paynter Esq., John P. Gidez Esq.,)
04/23/2015FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Washington, Chief Judge; and Pryor and Farrell, Senior Judges)
05/01/2015FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File to file Petition for Rehearing/Rehearing en banc. (Jenkins) (Appellant)
05/04/2015FiledMotion to correct the judgment (Jenkins) (Appellant)
05/05/2015FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File petition for rehearing or rehearing enbanc (Warren, Bates, Anderson) Other (Appellant)
05/07/2015FiledGRANT - Order Granting MOET to file petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc. (ETW)
05/07/2015FiledPetition For Rehearing (Anderson) (Appellant)
05/08/2015FiledGRANT - Order Granting joint unopposed MOET to file a petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc. (ETW)
05/19/2015FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant-Jenkins)
05/28/2015FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Warren) (Appellant)
05/29/2015FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Bates) (Appellant)
08/14/2015FiledOrder denying Petition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Bates) (Appellant), Petition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Warren) (Appellant), Petition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant-Jenkins), & Petition For Rehearing (Anderson) (Appellant)
08/18/2015FiledMotion To Stay Issuance Of The Mandate (Jenkins) (Appellant)Granted
09/11/2015FiledOrder Granting aplt Jenkins motion to stay issuance of the mandate.
09/15/2015FiledMandate (11-CF-281)
12/24/2015FiledCopy/Notice Of Petition For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant-Jenkins)
01/08/2016FiledCopy/Notice Of Petition For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant-Bates)
01/27/2016FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant-Bates)
01/27/2016FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant-Jenkins)
03/03/2016FiledCopy/Notice Of Petition For Writ Of Certiorari (Anderson) (Appellant)
03/30/2016FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant-Anderson)