judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RYAN JOSEPH HAGERMAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0155)
Parent: S-11-0154 Case Docketed On:06/21/2011
Consolidated:S-11-0155
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Fremont CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:RYAN JOSEPH HAGERMAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:RYAN JOSEPH HAGERMAN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRyan Joseph Hagerman Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Justin A. Daraie

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing -Credit for Time Served
Opinion Number:2011 WY 151
Citation:264 P.3d 18

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/21/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/21/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/21/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/28/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/26/2011Motion - Supplement the recordMotionSupplement the recordFinal
07/26/2011Motion - ConsolidateMotionConsolidateFinal
07/26/2011Motion - Supplement the record (Amended)MotionSupplement the recordFinal
08/02/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to supplement the record; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/02/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to join appeals; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/02/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Amended motion to supplement the recordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/08/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/09/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/09/2011Order - Consolidating cases and Order Granting Motion to Supplement RecordOrderConsolidating casesFinal
08/10/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/18/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant (Reply Brief)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/29/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
08/29/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/02/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes each case. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/02/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/07/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirmed in part and reversed and remanded in part. Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/23/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/23/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/23/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/23/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/30/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 11/29/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
12/23/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Mandate signed for by agent for warden at Wyoming medium correctional institution.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal