judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DEMECIO LOPEZ V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0280
Short Caption:DEMECIO LOPEZ V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Kidnapping
Lead: 11-CF-0209 Consolidated:11-CF-0280
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-10598-10Filed Date:03/02/2011

Opening Event Date:03/02/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/07/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/22/2012
Argued/Submitted:02/28/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/05/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDemecio LopezY
Phillip C. ZaneYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/02/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/23/2011ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 11-CF-209 and 11-CF-280 are consolidated for all purposes herein. F/O that Joseph A. Virgilio, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant Demecio Lopez in appeal no. 11-CF-280. F/O that counsel for appellant Demecio Lopez shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
03/29/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (11-CF-209) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
04/20/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) LOPEZ (RT ordered/needed (pii)
05/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (188 pgs/Zamora) 10/13/10 proc. w/cd
05/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (163 pgs/Burr) 10/14/10 proc.
05/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (117 pgs/Burr) 10/18/10 proc.
05/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (207 pgs/Burr) 10/19/10 proc.
05/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (397 pgs/Kaczorowski) 10/20-21/10 proc.
05/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (237 pgs/Johnson) 10/25/10 proc.
05/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (43 pgs/Zamora) 10/26/10 proc.
05/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (20 pgs/Zamora) 10/27/10 proc.
05/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (15 pgs/tape) 10/28/10 proc.
05/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (19 pgs/Kaczorowski) 10/29/10 proc.
05/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #11 (17 pgs/Janifer) 11/17/10 proc.
05/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #12 (23 pgs/tape) 12/10/10 proc.
05/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #13 (31 pgs/tape) 1/20/11 proc.
05/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #14 (26 pgs/tape) 2/18/11 proc.
06/07/2011RECORD COPIES (11-CF-280)
06/07/2011RECORD INDEX (11-CF-280)
06/07/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #15 (SEALED documents)
06/07/2011RECORD COPIES - (11-CF-209)
06/07/2011RECORD INDEX (11-CF-209)
06/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #16 (SEALED pleadings)
06/07/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/13/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellants' briefs and the limited appendixes including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
06/14/2011RECEIVED pro se request from Appellant for Change of Counsel.
06/21/2011LETTER referring to counsel for appellant the June 14 pro se motion for change of counsel. (TBN) (for Lopez)
07/25/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) (Lopez)
07/25/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) (Guevara)
08/05/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant Guevara's motion for extension to 10/24/11.
08/05/2011FiledOrder Granting appellant Lopez's motion for extension to 1/25/12.
08/11/2011LodgedReceived pro se letter regarding lack of cooperation from court-appointed counsel and request for appointment of new counsel. (Appellant)
08/15/2011FiledLetter To counsel for appellant referring the pro se motion from appellant for reappointment of new counsel
10/24/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Guevara) (Appellant)
10/27/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant Guevara's motion for extension to file brief and limited appendix to 1/23/12.
12/06/2011FiledMotion To Stay Appeal (Lopez) (Appellant)Denied as Moot
12/06/2011FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw (Lopez) (Appellant)Granted
12/19/2011FiledOrder Granting Counsel's motion to withdraw. (Withdraw Appointed Counsel Joseph Virgilio, Esquire for appellant Lopez.)
12/19/2011FiledBriefing Order for Lopez (see 12/19/11 order)
01/13/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File (Guevara) Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
01/26/2012FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw (Appellant)Granted
02/23/2012FiledAppointing Phillip Zane, Esquire, for appellant Lopez (Appellant)
02/23/2012FiledOrder Granting Counsel's motion to withdraw in appeal no. 11-CF-280 and granting appellant's motion for and extension of time in appeal no. 11-CF-209.
02/23/2012FiledBriefing Order, (see 2/23/12 order)
04/12/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Guevera) (Appellant)Granted
04/17/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File (Lopez) Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
05/03/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File (Lopez) Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 5/7/12 Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Guevera) (Appellant) to 6/22/12
05/03/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File (Lopez) Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Held in Abeyance
05/10/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File (Lopez) Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 5/29/12.
05/30/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
06/05/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Leave to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) Lopez
06/05/2012FiledBrief (Appellant) Lopez
06/05/2012FiledAppendix (attached to brief) (Appellant) Lopez
06/22/2012FiledBrief (Guevara) (Appellant)
06/22/2012FiledAppendix (Guevara) (Attached to Brief) (Appellant)
07/20/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
07/27/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 8/22/12
08/22/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
08/22/2012FiledBriefing Completed
10/03/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
10/03/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
10/09/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
12/21/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/14/2013FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
02/21/2013FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file reply brief.
02/21/2013FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
02/28/2013FiledArgued before Glickman, Oberly, Belson Appellant - Phillip C. Zane CJA - for Demecio Lopez
10/10/2013FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Glickman and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Belson, Senior Judge.)
11/05/2013FiledMandate (GUEVARA- 11-CF-209)
11/05/2013FiledMandate (LOPEZ- 11-CF-280)
02/28/2014FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Lopez) (Appellant)