judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHAMBLESS (LONNIE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38376
Short Caption:CHAMBLESS (LONNIE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Churchill Co. - Tenth Judicial District - 26509Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/23/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/23/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-14346
09/04/2001Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Court Reporter Anita C. Fillmore regarding transcripts. 01-14882
09/12/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 4/13/00. Court Reporter: Kathy Jackson. Filed in district court on: 8/29/01. 01-15453
09/12/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 8/29/00. Court Reporter: Anita Fillmore. Filed in district court on: 8/29/01. 01-15452
09/12/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 2/15/01. Court Reporter: not named. Filed in district court on: 8/29/01. 01-15455
09/21/2001Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Court Reporter Anita C. Fillmore in pursuant to the requirements of the NRAP. 01-15995
10/31/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, no fast track statement has been filed. Appellant's counsel Brian R. Morris shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order or show cause why Mr. Morris should not be sanctioned. 01-18213
11/14/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 01-19024
11/14/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-19026
12/03/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: December 11, 2001. 01-20194
12/12/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-20869
12/12/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 01-20871
12/28/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice re: Appellant's Appendix. 01-21844
02/25/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Schedule. Order Directing Full Briefing and Remanding for Designation of Counsel. On November 14, 2001, counsel for appellant filed a response explaining why he had not filed the fast track statement in a timely fashion and that he wishes to withdraw as counsel in this appeal. Because counsel for appellant has fulfilled the obligations placed on trial counsel by NRAP 3C(b), the motion is granted. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. If appellant is indigent, the district court shall have 30 days to appoint counsel. Otherwise, the district court shall order that within 30 days, appellant must retain counsel and counsel must enter an appearance in the district court. District court clerk: 5 days to transmit district court order to this court and serve a copy of this order of remand on appellate counsel. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. Appellate counsel shall have 60 days from the district court's order of appointment or counsel's appearance in the district court to file and serve the opening brief. fn3[This court notes that the fast track appendix filed does not comply with NRAP 3C(c)(2). The parties shall file a new appendix to the briefs. After reviewing counsel's response, this court declines to impose sanctions at this time.] The answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. 02-03433
03/08/2002Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from court reporter Anita Fillmore. In reference to the September, 2001 letter to this court (see 9/21/01 docket entry), payment has now been received for the cost of transcripts, and they are enclosed. 02-04213
03/08/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 2/14/01, 2/15/01. Court Reporter: Anita C. Fillmore. 02-04215
03/28/2002Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Order Appointing Counsel filed in district court on March 27, 2002. Robert V. Bogan is hereby appointed to represent Lonnie Chambless (docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 02-05527
04/05/2002Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 02-06078
05/29/2002MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: June 27, 2002. 02-09374
07/29/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to file the opening brief and appendix. Appellant shall, within 15 days of the date of this order, file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Respondent shall within 30 days of service of the opening brief, file and serve the answering brief. Appellant may file a reply brief within 30 days of service of the answering brief. 02-12948
09/11/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall, within 15 days of the date of this order, file and serve the opening brief and appendix or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Respondent shall, within 30 days of service of the opening brief, file and serve the answering brief. Appellant may file a reply brief within 30 days of service of the answering brief. 02-15712
09/26/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On May 12, 2003, this court entered an order transferring Mr. Bogan to disability inactive status. See In re: Disability of Robert V. Bogan, Docket No. 41279; SCR 117. Accordingly, we remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of appointing new counsel to represent appellant in this appeal. The district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order to appoint appellate counsel. Within 5 days from the appointment of appellate counsel, the district court clerk shall transmit to the clerk of this court a copy of the district court's written or minute order. New counsel shall have 60 days from the order of appointment to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. 03-16138
10/01/2003Other Other. Received copy of Certificate of Death for Appellant Lonnie Chambless from District Judge Archie Blake. (Received VIA FAX) 03-16319
11/07/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. On October 1, 2003, this court received a copy of the death certificate for appellant. Because appellant is deceased, this appeal is moot, and we "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP04S-NB/MS/MG 03-18583
12/02/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-19306
12/02/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/22/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 4, 2003. 03-19306