judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DHARMINDER VIR SEN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0151)
Case Number:S-11-0151Case Docketed On:06/17/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:DHARMINDER VIR SEN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DHARMINDER VIR SEN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDharminder Vir SenDiane Elizabeth Courselle
Brian Quinn
Cally Lund
Samantha Lind
Joanne Sweeney
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
D. Michael Pauling
David L. Delicath
Justin A. Daraie
Theodore R. Racines
Jeffrey Scott Pope

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel, Criminal Law -Juvenile Court, Criminal Law -Search and Seizure, Criminal Law -Sentencing, Evidence
Opinion Number:2013 WY 47
Citation:301 P.3d 106

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/17/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/17/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/17/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/26/2011Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Diane E. Courselle for appellant.Notice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
07/27/2011Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/28/2011Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
07/28/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Entry of Appearance and Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/28/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/29/2011Order -Allowing Withdrawal of CounselOrderOtherFinal
09/08/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/09/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/09/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/27/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/03/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Brief (No further)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/03/2011Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
12/19/2011Motion - Remand to district courtMotionRemand to district courtFinal
12/21/2011Event - Phone Call - from Mike Pauling at the AG's office. They will not be responding to the motion for remand.EventPhone CallFinal
12/21/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for remand for hearing on ineffective assistance of counsel claim; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/28/2011Affidavit - Other - supplement to motion to remand.AffidavitOtherFinal
01/03/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Supplement to Motion to Remand for Hearing on Ineffective Assistance of Counsel ClaimEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/11/2012Order - Denying motion for remand for hearingOrderDenyFinal
01/30/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/31/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on Appeal (Student Interns on Brief--no Consent of Client)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/09/2012Event - Phone Call regarding extra time to file motion to file amicus, will file a motion for extension of timeEventPhone CallFinal
02/09/2012Motion - Amicus - leave to participate - Juvenile Law Center and Center of Wrongful Convictions of Youth (CWCY); and received Brief of Amici CuriaeMotionAmicus - leave to participateFinal
02/10/2012Motion - Amicus - leave to participate - ACLU; and received Brief of Amicus Curiae.MotionAmicus - leave to participateFinal
02/28/2012Order - Amicus - deny participation - Order denying motions for leave to file amicus curiae briefsOrderAmicus - deny participationFinal
03/19/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/20/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on Appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/05/2012Notice-Incoming - Consent of ClientNotice-IncomingConsent of ClientFinal
04/05/2012Notice-Incoming - Consent of ClientNotice-IncomingConsent of ClientFinal
04/05/2012Notice-Incoming - Consent of ClientNotice-IncomingConsent of ClientFinal
04/05/2012Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
04/06/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/06/2012Event - Phone Call, leaving message at Defender Aid Clinic requesting original copies of Consent of ClientEventPhone CallFinal
04/06/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/10/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/11/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
04/11/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, six volumes. Volumes I-III, Original Papers; Volume IV, Transcripts - containing eight volumes; Volume V, Confidential Documents; Volume VI, Exhibits - containing two volumes.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/11/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/13/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Consent of Client for Samantha Lind, Cally Lund & Brian QuinnEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/18/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Diane Courselle and Samantha Lind obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/23/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Justin Daraie obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/14/2012Correspondence - Incoming Additional AuthorityCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
05/15/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Additional AuthorityEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/16/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice. Argued before Chief Justice Kite, Justices Golden, Hill, Voigt and Burke (Diane Courselle, Samantha Lind, argument by Ms. Lind for Appellant; Justin Daraie for Appellee) and taken under advisement.Notice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
07/12/2012Motion - Remand to district courtMotionRemand to district courtFinal
07/12/2012Motion - Supplemental briefingMotionSupplemental briefingFinal
07/16/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Renewed Motion to Remand for Hearing on Ineffective Assistance of Counsel Claim; Motion Requesting Supplemental Briefing; and received proposed orders.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/07/2012Order - Denying Renewed Motion for Remand for Hearing and Order Granting Request for Supplemental BriefingOrderDenyFinal
09/07/2012Notice-Incoming - Consent of ClientNotice-IncomingConsent of ClientFinal
09/07/2012Brief - Supplemental appellantBriefSupplemental appellantFinal
09/10/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Supplemental Brief for Appellant; and Consent of Client.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/10/2012Brief - Supplemental appelleeBriefSupplemental appelleeFinal
10/11/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Supplemental Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/06/2012Order - Other - Order Notifying Parties that Further Oral Argument Will Be ScheduledOrderOtherFinal
11/09/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/16/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Jeffrey Pope obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/30/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Joanne Sweeney obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/07/2012Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
12/10/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of additional authorityEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/12/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice on rehearing. Argued before Chief Justice Kite, Justices Hill, Voigt, Burke and Golden, Ret. (Diane Courselle, Joanne Sweeney, argument by Ms. Sweeney, for Appellant; Jeffrey S. Pope for Appellee) and taken under advisementNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/24/2013Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part, vacating in part, and remanding. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/30/2013Service - Certified mail signature return card - Opinion signed for (undated) by agent for warden at WSP.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
05/10/2013Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/10/2013Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/10/2013Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/10/2013Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/14/2013Service - Certified mail signature return card - Opinion signed for 5/13/2013 by agent for Warden at WSP.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
05/16/2013Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/13/2013.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal