judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

THAI CHILI, INC., ET AL V. PRAPEESUK BENNETT, ET AL

Case Information: 11-CV-0248
Short Caption:THAI CHILI, INC., ET AL V. PRAPEESUK BENNETT, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB8502-05Filed Date:02/23/2011

Opening Event Date:02/23/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/18/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/20/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/16/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/23/2013

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSomchai Phongsvirajati N
Gregory T. Jaeger YN
Ronald K. Henry YN
AppellantChaveevarn Kawano N
Gregory T. Jaeger YN
Ronald K. Henry YN
AppellantSiriphen Thamvichai N
Ronald K. Henry YN
Gregory T. Jaeger YN
AppelleeNeiyana Chotikul N
Geoffrey Greeves YN
Tab R. Turano NN
AppelleeJeffrey Chotikul N
Geoffrey Greeves YN
Tab R. Turano NN
AppelleeThanakorn Duangmanee N
Geoffrey Greeves YN
Tab R. Turano NN
AppelleeJoanne Duangmanee N
Geoffrey Greeves YN
Tab R. Turano NN
AppelleeAtit Phutilikit N
Geoffrey Greeves YN
Tab R. Turano NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/23/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/11/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on February 23, 2011, and it appearing that transcript may be needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellants shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellants must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellants must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellants' failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
03/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (56-pgs/tape 6/4/08 proc.)
03/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (243-pgs/tape 6/5/08 proc.)
03/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (203-pgs/tape 6/6/08 proc.)
03/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#4 (102-pgs/tape 7/23/08 proc.)
03/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#5 (170-pgs/tape 7/24/08 proc.)
03/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#6 (122-pgs/tape 7/25/08 proc.)
03/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#7 (138-pgs/tape 7/31/08 proc.)
03/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#8 (164-pgs/tape 8/1/08 proc.)
03/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#9 (49-pgs/tape 9/23/08 proc.)
03/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#10 (94-pgs/tape 9/24/08 proc.)
03/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#11 (118-pgs/tape 9/25/08 proc.)
03/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#12(140-pgs/tape 9/26/08 proc.)
03/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#13(141-pgs/tape 9/29/08 proc.)
03/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#14 (142-pgs/tape 9/30/08 proc.)
03/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#15(71-pgs/tape 10/21/08 proc.)
03/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#16(121-pgs/pgs 10/21/08 proc.)
03/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#17 (185-pgs/tape 10/30/08 proc.)
03/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#18 (200-pgs/tape 10/31/08 proc.)
03/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#19 (170-pgs/tape 1/5/09 proc)
03/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#20 (186-pgs/tape 1/6/09 proc.)
03/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#21 (162-pgs/tape 1/7/09 proc.)
03/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#22 (234-pgs/tape 1/8/09 proc.)
03/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#23(148-psg/tape 1/9/09 proc.)
03/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #24 (52-pgs/allison 4/15/10 proc.)
03/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#25 (32-pgs/armstrong 5/5/10 proc.)
03/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#26 (39-pgs/johnson 8/17/10 proc.)w/cd
03/18/2011RECORD INDEX
03/18/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/29/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 6/4-6/6/08, 7/23-7/25/08, 7/31/08, 8/1/08, 9/23-26/08, 9/29-30/08, 10/21/08, 10/30-31/08, 1/5-9/09, 4/15/10, 5/5/10, & 8/17/10) (elp) ***SEE 3/16/11, ENTRIES FOR TRANSCRIPTS FILED ABOVE. (elp)
03/29/2011APPEARANCE - of Gregory T. Jaeger on behalf of aplts
03/29/2011APPEARANCE- of Ronald K. Henry on behalf of aplt
03/30/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellants' brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
05/09/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
05/09/2011APPENDIX 3 volumes
06/07/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo 6/20/11
06/15/2011 On consideration of appellees' unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellees' brief shall be filed on or before June 20, 2011. (JAC) elp
06/20/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
06/20/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
07/05/2011APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF no oppo to 7/25/11
07/13/2011FiledOrder Granting APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF
07/25/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant Kawano, Appellant Phongsvirajati, Appellant Thamvichai)
08/10/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
09/14/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/14/2012FiledLetter From appellant's attorney advising court that Ronald K. Henry will argue the case (Appellant Kawano, Appellant Phongsvirajati, Appellant Thamvichai)
02/16/2012FiledArgued before Judges Fisher, Beckwith, King
09/26/2013FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Fisher and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and King, Senior Judge)
10/23/2013FiledMandate