judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES BECKHAM V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0247
Short Caption:JAMES BECKHAM V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM3069-09Filed Date:02/25/2011

Opening Event Date:02/25/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/14/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames Beckham Y
Geneva G. VanderhorstNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/25/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/10/2011 ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been UNTIMELY FILED. See DC App R. 4 (b). (BY: ETW)
03/10/2011TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
03/29/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - dated 3/10/11
04/06/2011 ORDERED that this APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED AS UNTIMELY FILED but W/O PREJUDICE to filing a motion to reinstate if the motion for leave to late file is granted...SEE HARDCOPY It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall transmit a copy of both the NOA and COUNSEL'S RESPONSE to the Clerk of Superior Court to be filed as a motion for leave to late file the NOA under DC App. R. 4(b)(4). (GLPRFE) (rm)
04/06/2011DISMISSED
04/08/2011RECEIVED - SR #1 --(96pgs/Kaczorowski) 12/13/10 proc.
04/08/2011RECEIVED - SR #2 -- (93pgs/Ransom-Jones) 12/14/10 proc.
04/08/2011RECEIVED - SR #3 -- (141pgs/Kaczorowski) 12-15-16/10 proc.
04/08/2011RECEIVED - SR #4 -- (24pgs/Tape) 1/21/11 proc.
04/08/2011RECEIVED - SR#5 -- (45pgs/Tape) 1/25/11 proc. w/CD
11/14/2011FiledMandate