judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COLWELL (LAWRENCE) VS. STATE (DEATH PENALTY)

Case Information: 38375
Short Caption:COLWELL (LAWRENCE) VS. STATE (DEATH PENALTY)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33401
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C123476Classification:Criminal Appeal - Death Penalty - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/27/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/23/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/23/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-14342
09/12/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Redesignation of Appeal. Upon further review, it has been determined that this is not a fast track appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
10/03/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-16614
10/04/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Judgment filed on 9/10/01 and Notice of Entry of Decision and Order filed on 9/14/01. Due Date: 10 days
10/12/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order appealed from filed in district court on: September 10, 2001. 01-17266
10/12/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on: September 14, 2001. 01-17267
12/21/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-21565
12/31/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed December 21, 2001. Appellant shall have to and including February 4, 2002, to file and serve the opening brief and appenidix. 01-21869
02/04/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-02216
02/08/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed February 4, 2002 . Appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix by February 8, 2002. 02-02557
02/14/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-02930
02/14/2002MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. 02-02932
02/22/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk shall file the 32-page opening brief and appendix received on February 14, 2002. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 02-03360
02/22/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 02/13/02-Federal Express. Signed by Christopher R. Oram. 02-02933
02/22/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 and 2. 02-02934
03/26/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. Signed by: Lynn M. Robinson. 02-05314
03/26/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 02-05315
04/25/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 04/24/02. Signed by: Christopher R. Oram. 02-07312
04/25/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/03/2002MotionFiled Motion. Appellant's Motion to Supplement Brief. 02-09611
07/31/2002MotionFiled Motion. Appellant's Motion to Supplement Brief. 02-13167
08/07/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The motions filed June 3, 2002 and July 31, 2002 are hereby granted. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order within which to file and serve a supplemental brief of no more that 30 pages. The State shall have fifteen days from the date of service of appellant's supplemental brief within which to file and serve a supplemental answering brief of no more than 30 pages. Upon the filing of the State's supplemental answering brief, the appeal shall once again stand submitted for decision. 02-13478
08/12/2002MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Supplement Brief. 02-13699
08/19/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On August 12, 2002, this court received and filed the State's opposition to appellant's motion of July 31, 2002, requesting leave to file supplemental points and authorities. On August 7, 2002, this court entered an order granting appellant's motion. We elect to treat the State's opposition as a motion to reconsider our order of August 7, 2002. No good cause having been shown, we deny the motion. The State may present it's arguments regarding the non-applicability of Ring in its supplemental answering brief. 02-14155
08/23/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to File Supplement to Briefs. 02-14497
08/27/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Motion Granted in Part. Appellant shall have to and including September 10, 2002, to file and serve the supplemental brief on appeal. The State shall have 15 days from the date of service of appellant's supplemental brief to file and serve a supplemental answering brief. 02-14727
09/11/2002BriefFiled Supplemental Brief. Appellant's Supplement to Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 09/10/02. 02-15710
09/27/2002BriefFiled Supplemental Brief. Supplemental Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 02-16795
09/27/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Supplemental Briefs.
12/18/2002Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Per Curiam. 118 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 80. EN BANC 02-21637
12/31/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-22240
01/03/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed December 31, 2002. Appellant shall have until January 10, 2003, to file and serve a petition for rehearing. 03-00174
01/13/2003Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Mailed on January 10, 2003. 03-00603
02/20/2003Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). fn1[The Honorable Mark W. Gibbons, Justice, did not patiicipate in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC 03-02883
03/03/2003MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Motion to Stay Issuance of Remittitur. 03-03377
03/13/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed March 3, 2002. We hereby stay the remittitur until June 4, 2003. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by June 4, 2002, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by June 4, 2003, the remittitur shall issue on June 5, 2003. 03-04213
06/06/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Denied. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed May 21, 2003 and placed on the docket as Case No. 02-10947. 03-09461
11/10/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Granted. The petition for a writ of ceritorari is denied. 03-18740
11/12/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Issuance of Remittitur. This is an appeal from an order of the district court denying appellant's post-conviction petition for a writ of habeas corpus in a capital case. On March 13, 2003, this court stayed issuance of the remittitur in this appeal pending final disposition of appellant's petition for a writ of certiorari filed in the United States Supreme Court. On November 10, 2003, the clerk of this court received notice that the United States Supreme Court denied appellant's petition on November 3, 2003. Accordingly, we direct the clerk of this court to issue the remittitur in this appeal. 03-18841
11/12/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-18891
11/12/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/04/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 14, 2003. 03-18891