judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

VINCENT JAMES SCOTT v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0150)
Case Number:S-11-0150Case Docketed On:06/17/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:VINCENT JAMES SCOTT v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:VINCENT JAMES SCOTT, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantVincent James ScottDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
D. Michael Pauling
David L. Delicath
Travis J. Kirchhefer

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel, Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2012 WY 86
Citation:278 P.3d 747 (Wyo. 2012)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/17/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/17/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/17/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/03/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/04/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/04/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/20/2011Brief - Failure to file - appellantBriefFailure to file - appellantFinal
09/20/2011Order - Dismiss - want of prosecutionOrderDismiss - want of prosecutionFinal
09/20/2011Motion - ReinstatementMotionReinstatement of caseFinal
09/20/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's verified motion to set aside dismissal and reinstate appeal; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/11/2011Order - ReinstatementOrderReinstatementFinal
11/10/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/10/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/28/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/28/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/09/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/18/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/19/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
01/25/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/25/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts (containing 3 volumes).RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/25/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/18/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/05/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/05/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/05/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/05/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/09/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/6/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal