judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JAMES E. BELLIS and BETTE LU BELLIS, husband and wife v. RONNY L. KERSEY and PEGGY J. KERSEY, husband and wife and BENJAMIN H. HOWARD, JR., BENJAMIN H. HOWARD, IV, ROCKY MOUNTAIN TIMBERLANDS, INC., and GENERAL EDUCATION FOUNDATION, INC.

Case Heading (S-10-0013)
Case Number:S-10-0013Case Docketed On:01/12/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Platte CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:JAMES E. BELLIS and BETTE LU BELLIS, husband and wife v. RONNY L. KERSEY and PEGGY J. KERSEY, husband and wife and BENJAMIN H. HOWARD, JR., BENJAMIN H. HOWARD, IV, ROCKY MOUNTAIN TIMBERLANDS, INC., and GENERAL EDUCATION FOUNDATION, INC.
Full Title:JAMES E. BELLIS and BETTE LU BELLIS, husband and wife, Appellants (Defendants/Plaintiffs), v. RONNY L. KERSEY and PEGGY J. KERSEY, husband and wife, Appellees (Plaintiffs), and BENJAMIN H. HOWARD, JR., BENJAMIN H. HOWARD, IV, ROCKY MOUNTAIN TIMBERLANDS, INC., and GENERAL EDUCATION FOUNDATION, INC., Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJames E. BellisFrank J. Jones
AppellantBette Lu BellisFrank J. Jones
AppelleeRonny L. KerseyGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
AppelleePeggy J. KerseyGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
AppelleeBenjamin H. Howard Jr.William H. Vines
AppelleeBenjamin H. Howard IVWilliam H. Vines
AppelleeRocky Mountain Timberlands, Inc.William H. Vines
AppelleeGeneral Education Foundation, Inc.

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Property - Real - Adverse Possession
Opinion Number:2010 WY 138
Citation:241 P.3d 818

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/12/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/12/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/12/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/11/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/12/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time in which to file brief of appellants; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/12/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/16/2010Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
03/26/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/26/2010Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
03/26/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellants James E. Bellis and Bette Lu Bellis and Statement of CostsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/12/2010Brief - Appellee (Howard and RMT)BriefAppelleeFinal
05/13/2010Brief - Appellees (Ronny L. Kersey and Peggy J. Kersey)BriefAppelleeFinal
05/13/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellees Ronny L. Kersey and Peggy J. KerseyEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/13/2010Record - Other - Received oversized exhibit from the Clerk of District Court. Delivered by Counsel for Appellees Ronny L. Kersey and Peggy J. Kersey.RecordOtherFinal
05/14/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellees Benjamin H. Howard, Jr., Benjamin H. Howard, IV and Rocky Mountain Timberlands, Inc.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/02/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/11/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, eight volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volumes IV-VII, Exhibits; Volume VIII, Depositions.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/11/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/23/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
06/25/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - W. H. Vines for appellees Howard and Rocky Mountain Timberlands, Inc.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/05/2010Event - Phone Call - Gay Woodhouse will argue on behalf of appellees Kersey.EventPhone CallFinal
08/05/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Frank Jones for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/18/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Frank J. Jones for appellant; William H. Vines and Gay Vanderpoel Woodhouse for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/18/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
09/28/2010Event - Rejected Filing. Received "complaint" from appellants. Not filed, but sent correspondence to appellants.EventRejected FilingFinal
10/26/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/01/2010Motion - Supplemental briefing - Pro se motion of appellants James E. Bellis and Bette Lu Bellis requesting permission to file a supplemental brief. (No certificate of service - no response time)MotionSupplemental briefingFinal
11/16/2010Order - Supplemental briefing - denyOrderSupplemental briefing - denyFinal
11/16/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/16/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/16/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/16/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/22/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 11/19/2010.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
06/29/2011Event - Rejected Filing - received request from appellant for court to undertake further review. Returned without filing.EventRejected FilingFinal